Global Patent Index - EP 0968951 A1

EP 0968951 A1 2000-01-05 - Method for operating a textile machine producing crosswound bobbins

Title (en)

Method for operating a textile machine producing crosswound bobbins

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Kreuzspulen herstellenden Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Procédé de fonctionnement d'une machine textile pour la fabrication de bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 0968951 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99107127 A

Priority

DE 19829597 A

Abstract (en)

In the operation of a bobbin winder, to give cross wound bobbins in a random winding, the angular speed of the rotating bobbin (4) is monitored continuously, and the speed readings are processed in a control unit (18). On or shortly before reaching a patterned winding zone, the winding speed is reduced by a defined setting of the pressure of the bobbin (4) laying on the yarn guide drum (3), at a point as defined by the dia. of the bobbin and the measured angular speed. The reduced winding speed is below the critical winding speed where a bobbin of a given dia. is rotated without slip. The reduced winding speed is below the critical speed where there is no slip for a bobbin of a given dia. on leaving the patterned winding zone. The reduced winding speed is maintained until the winding has passed through the patterned winding zone. On passing through the patterned winding zone, the bobbin is given a constant braking moment, and the winding speed is controlled by the pressure of the wound bobbin (4) against the yarn guide drum (3). The brake moment is through the air friction of the rotating bobbin (4), or the bearing friction at the bobbin mounting at the bobbin frame (5). The brake moment is used during the friction emerging from the yarn moment, during rewinding. The adjustment of the pressure of the bobbin (4) on the yarn guide drum (3) is through a step motor (17).

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Kreuzspulen herstellenden Textilmaschine, die Kreuzspulen (4) nach der Wicklungsart <IMAGE>wilde Wicklung" erstellt, wobei zur Vermeidung von Bildwickelzonen (BWZ) der Auflagedruck, mit der die Kreuzspule (4) auf der Fadenführungstrommel (3) aufliegt, reguliert und die Kreuzspule (4) gleichzeitig mit einem Bremsmoment beaufschlagt wird. Erfindungsgemäß ist dabei vorgesehen, daß die Winkelgeschwindigkeit w der Kreuzspule (4) ständig erfaßt und in einer Steuereinrichtung (18) derart verarbeitet wird, daß beim Erreichen oder kurz vor dem Erreichen einer sogenannten Bildwicklungszone (BWZ) die durch den Durchmesser d1 der Kreuzspule (4) vorgegebene Winkelgeschwindigkeit w1 durch definiertes Einstellen des Auflagedruckes, mit dem die Kreuzspule (4) auf der Fadenführungstrommel (3) aufliegt, auf eine Winkelgeschwindigkeit w2 abgesenkt wird, die unter der Winkelgeschwindigkeit wk einer schlupflos angetriebenen Kreuzspule (4) mit einem Bildwickel verursachenden, kritischen Durchmesser dk liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 54/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/06 (2006.01); B65H 54/38 (2006.01); B65H 54/52 (2006.01); D05B 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/38 (2013.01); B65H 2515/34 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968951 A1 20000105; EP 0968951 B1 20020724; DE 19829597 A1 20000105; JP 2000026021 A 20000125; TR 9901545 A2 20000221; TR 9901545 A3 20000221; US 6206320 B1 20010327

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160429

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160423

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-07-15 [REG CH PCOW] CHANGE OF ADDRESS OF PATENT OWNER(S)

- Free text: NEW ADDRESS: LEVERKUSER STRASSE 65, 42897 REMSCHEID (DE)

2013-08-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER AND PARTNER AG PATENT- UND MARKENANW, CH

2013-08-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SAURER GERMANY GMBH AND CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: W. SCHLAFHORST AG AND CO., DE

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081231

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070413

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902098 20020829

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2002-07-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO.

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI