Global Patent Index - EP 0968955 A2

EP 0968955 A2 2000-01-05 - Composite material jib

Title (en)

Composite material jib

Title (de)

Ausleger aus Verbundwerkstoff

Title (fr)

Flèche de matériau composite

Publication

EP 0968955 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99112763 A

Priority

DE 19829829 A

Abstract (en)

At least one section (10) of a jib of a crane, such as a mobile crane, includes a composite cross-section incorporating a layer of steel (11) covered by one or more fiber composite layers (12,13). In a preferred embodiment, more than one fiber composite layer (12,13) is included and the respective fiber layers (12,13) are disposed in a crisscross manner with respect to each other to enhance the overall strength of the telescopic part (10). Also, in a preferred embodiment the steel layer (11) of the composite is on the interior of the telescopic part (10) for minimizing thermal stresses due to temperature changes caused by sun loads. In another preferred embodiment, the composite fiber layers (12,13) are disposed only in the zone of the cross-section of the telescopic part (10), which is subjected to tensile forces during use. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66C 23/70; B29C 67/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/687 (2006.01); B66C 23/697 (2006.01); B66C 23/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 23/701 (2013.01); Y10T 428/249942 (2015.04); Y10T 428/249951 (2015.04); Y10T 442/3415 (2015.04); Y10T 442/656 (2015.04)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0117774 A1 19840905 - CREUSOT LOIRE [FR]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968955 A2 20000105; EP 0968955 A3 20001206; EP 0968955 B1 20040225; CA 2276925 A1 20000103; CA 2276925 C 20080226; DE 19829829 A1 20000113; ES 2215344 T3 20041001; JP 2000191281 A 20000711; JP 3214844 B2 20011002; US 6586084 B1 20030701

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090725

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090716

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-09 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090624

2009-09-09 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090624

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TEREX-DEMAG GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041123

2005-06-15 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: TEREX-DEMAG GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041123

2005-01-19 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TEREX-DEMAG GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20041123

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2215344 T3

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69914974 P 20040401

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 66C 23/70 A

2004-02-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 29C 67/24 B

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010209

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 66C 23/70 A, 7B 29C 67/14 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI