Global patent index - EP 0968956 A1

EP 0968956 A1 2000-01-05 - Corkscrew

Title (en)

Corkscrew

Title (de)

Korkenzieher

Title (fr)

Tire-bouchon

Publication

EP 0968956 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98112347 A

Priority

EP 98112347 A

Abstract (en)

The frame (2) has two evolving legs (3,4) movable towards each other and a device (17) for support on the neck of a bottle. The legs are of the individual type and via the bearing part (8) Formed on at least one leg are sprung-connected to one another. Where the bearing part is formed on one leg it is provided with a positive engagement retainer for the other leg. The one leg (4) has a bearing socket (6) of metal and the second leg (3) is provided with an inner bearing socket of sprung plastic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67B 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67B 7/0441 (2013.01); B67B 2007/0458 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0968956 A1 20000105; EP 0968956 B1 20001115; AT 197584 T 20001215; DE 59800343 D1 20001221; ES 2153226 T3 20010216

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2008-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020731

- Year of fee payment: 04

2008-01-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060704

2007-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20060704

2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 09

2006-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060201

2005-07-15 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050715

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-06-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050616

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-08-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040809

- Year of fee payment: 07

2004-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-07-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040703

2003-07-25 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030725

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-07-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030724

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-07-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 06

2003-07-16 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030716

- Year of fee payment: 06

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2153226

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-12-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001204

2000-12-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59800343

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20001221

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 197584

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20001215

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-02-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981217

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI