Global patent index - EP 0969068 A1

EP 0969068 A1 2000-01-05 - ADHESIVE RESIN COMPOSITION AND HEAT-SHRINKABLE ARTICLES MADE BY USING THE SAME

Title (en)

ADHESIVE RESIN COMPOSITION AND HEAT-SHRINKABLE ARTICLES MADE BY USING THE SAME

Title (de)

KLEBHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DAMIT HERGESTELLTE WÄRMESCHRUMPFBARE ARTIKEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITION DE RESINE ADHESIVE ET ARTICLES THERMORETRACTABLES REALISES AVEC CETTE COMPOSITION

Publication

EP 0969068 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99900161 A

Priority

  • JP 9900054 W
  • JP 1472598 A

Abstract (en)

A hot-melt adhesive comprises a resin composition comprising (a) from 0.1 to 50 parts by weight of a polyolefin resin obtained by copolymerizing 80% by weight or more of a non-polar alpha -olefin with 20% by weight or less in total of a monomer containing 5% by weight or more of a carboxyl group and a polar alpha -olefin, or with 20% by weight or less in total of a monomer containing 0.5% by weight or more of an acid anhydride group and a polar alpha -olefin, (b) from 0 to 80 parts by weight of a copolymer of ethylene and a non-polar alpha -olefin, or a polyolefin resin containing 20% by weight or less of a polar alpha -olefin, and (c) from 10 to 90 parts by weight of a polyamide, provided that the total amount of the components (a), (b) and (c) is 100 parts by weight, the resin composition having a melt index of 5 g/10 min or more and less than 500 g/10 min. The hot-melt adhesive resin composition of the invention has excellent adhesiveness to both non-polar and polar adherends. A heat recoverable article using the hot-melt adhesive is valuable for processing a joint and an end of electric cables.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09J 177/08; B32B 7/12; B32B 27/32; C08L 77/00; C08L 77/08; C09J 123/00; C09J 123/08; C09J 177/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08L 77/00 (2006.01); C08L 77/08 (2006.01); C09J 123/06 (2006.01); C09J 123/08 (2006.01); C09J 177/00 (2006.01); C09J 177/06 (2006.01); C09J 177/08 (2006.01); C08L 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09J 123/08 (2013.01); C08L 77/00 (2013.01); C08L 77/08 (2013.01); C09J 123/06 (2013.01); C09J 123/0869 (2013.01); C09J 177/00 (2013.01); C09J 177/06 (2013.01); C09J 177/08 (2013.01); C08L 23/0846 (2013.01); C08L 23/0869 (2013.01); C08L 2205/03 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08L 77/00 + C08L 23/00
  2. C08L 77/08 + C08L 2666/06
  3. C09J 177/00 + C08L 2666/04
  4. C09J 177/00 + C08L 23/00
  5. C09J 177/06 + C08L 23/00
  6. C09J 177/08 + C08L 23/00
  7. C09J 177/08 + C08L 2666/04
  8. C09J 177/08 + C08L 2666/06
  9. C09J 123/06 + C08L 2666/02
  10. C09J 123/08 + C08L 2666/20
  11. C09J 123/0869 + C08L 2666/02

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9935206A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969068 A1 20000105; EP 0969068 A4 20041222; EP 0969068 B1 20060524; AT 327298 T 20060615; AU 1785299 A 19990726; AU 741527 B2 20011206; CA 2281707 A1 19990715; CA 2281707 C 20080325; CN 1187424 C 20050202; CN 1255937 A 20000607; DE 69931429 D1 20060629; DE 69931429 T2 20061019; ES 2265177 T3 20070201; ID 23934 A 20000602; JP 4385409 B2 20091216; KR 100607783 B1 20060801; KR 20000076245 A 20001226; TW 530085 B 20030501; US 6306954 B1 20011023; WO 9935206 A1 19990715

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150109

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160105

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20160226

2016-01-12 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69931429

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-01-12 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 69931429

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150108

2015-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150109

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150108

2015-10-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20150930

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150108

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20141231

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140108

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131209

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140113

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131211

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2265177

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2006-09-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-08-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060824

2006-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69931429

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20060629

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2006-05-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060524

2006-05-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050512

2004-12-22 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 7/12 B

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 32B 27/32 B

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08L 77/00 B

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 08L 77/08 B

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09J 123/00 B

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09J 123/08 B

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09J 177/00 B

2004-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 09J 177/08 A

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990820

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE