Global patent index - EP 0969078 A2

EP 0969078 A2 2000-01-05 - Process for treating formed metal surfaces

Title (en)

Process for treating formed metal surfaces

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Behandlung von geformten Metalloberflächen

Title (fr)

Procédé de traitement de surfaces métalliques embouties

Publication

EP 0969078 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99203252 A

Priority

  • EP 93916982 A
  • US 9306359 W
  • US 91048392 A

Abstract (en)

A process for treating an aluminium can, comprising the steps of cleaning with an aqueous acidic or alkaline solution, drying and subsequently conveying the cleaned and dried can via automatic conveying equipment to a location where it is lacquered or decorated by printing or both. At least one exterior surface of the can, prior to the last drying of the surface before automatic conveying, is contacted with a lubricant and surface conditioner forming composition comprising ethoxylated, hydrogenated castor oil triglycerides, and the can is then dried without subsequent rinsing, thereby forming a film on the can to provide the surface of the can after drying with a reduced coefficient of static friction compared to an otherwise identical sequence of treatments where the lubricant and surface conditioner forming composition is substituted with water.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/02; C23C 22/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 51/26 (2006.01); C10M 107/34 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01); C10M 173/02 (2006.01); C23C 22/34 (2006.01); C10N 10/06 (2006.01); C10N 10/08 (2006.01); C10N 10/10 (2006.01); C10N 10/12 (2006.01); C10N 10/16 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 22/34 (2013.01); C10M 107/34 (2013.01); C10M 173/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/05 (2013.01); C10M 2201/06 (2013.01); C10M 2201/08 (2013.01); C10M 2201/081 (2013.01); C10M 2201/082 (2013.01); C10M 2201/084 (2013.01); C10M 2201/18 (2013.01); C10M 2207/021 (2013.01); C10M 2207/022 (2013.01); C10M 2207/023 (2013.01); C10M 2207/04 (2013.01); C10M 2207/046 (2013.01); C10M 2207/123 (2013.01); C10M 2207/124 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/14 (2013.01); C10M 2207/142 (2013.01); C10M 2207/22 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/284 (2013.01); C10M 2207/285 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/40 (2013.01); C10M 2207/402 (2013.01); C10M 2207/404 (2013.01); C10M 2209/04 (2013.01); C10M 2209/06 (2013.01); C10M 2209/062 (2013.01); C10M 2209/082 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2209/086 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/105 (2013.01); C10M 2209/106 (2013.01); C10M 2209/107 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10M 2209/109 (2013.01); C10M 2209/12 (2013.01); C10M 2211/044 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/042 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/12 (2013.01); C10M 2215/122 (2013.01); C10M 2215/204 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2217/00 (2013.01); C10M 2217/02 (2013.01); C10M 2217/04 (2013.01); C10M 2219/04 (2013.01); C10M 2219/042 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/041 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/06 (2013.01); C10M 2223/061 (2013.01); C10M 2223/065 (2013.01); C10M 2225/00 (2013.01); C10M 2225/02 (2013.01); C10M 2225/04 (2013.01); C10M 2225/041 (2013.01); C10M 2227/00 (2013.01); C10M 2227/06 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10M 2227/062 (2013.01); C10M 2227/063 (2013.01); C10M 2227/065 (2013.01); C10M 2227/066 (2013.01); C10N 2240/00 (2013.01); C10N 2240/22 (2013.01); C10N 2240/30 (2013.01); C10N 2240/50 (2013.01); C10N 2240/52 (2013.01); C10N 2240/54 (2013.01); C10N 2240/56 (2013.01); C10N 2240/58 (2013.01); C10N 2240/60 (2013.01); C10N 2240/66 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 173/02 + C10M 125/00 + C10M 129/06 + C10M 129/08 + C10M 129/16 + C10M 129/34 + C10M 129/36 + C10M 129/40 + C10M 129/52 + C10M 129/70 + C10M 129/72 + C10M 133/06 + C10M 133/08 + C10M 133/16 + C10M 133/34 + C10M 135/08 + C10M 135/10 + C10M 137/04 + C10M 137/12 + C10M 139/00 + C10M 145/04 + C10M 145/12 + C10M 145/16 + C10M 145/28 + C10M 145/30 + C10M 145/34 + C10M 145/36 + C10M 145/38 + C10M 145/40 + C10M 149/12 + C10M 153/04 + C10M 159/08
  2. C10M 173/02 + C10M 145/38 + C10M 125/18

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9401517 A1 19940120; AU 4665493 A 19940131; AU 675800 B2 19970220; BR 9306696 A 19981208; CA 2135920 A1 19940120; CN 1085244 A 19940413; EP 0649458 A1 19950426; EP 0649458 A4 19960214; EP 0969078 A2 20000105; EP 0969078 A3 20000223; JP H07509261 A 19951012; MD 960241 A 19980430; MX 9304090 A 19940331; ZA 9304846 B 19940203

INPADOC legal status

2001-06-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001219

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

2000-09-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLY, TIMM L.

2000-09-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROCHFORT, GARY L.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KELLY, TIMM L.

2000-05-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROCHFORT, GARY L.

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT SE

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991019

2000-01-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Document Number: 649458

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB GR IT SE