Global patent index - EP 0969111 A1

EP 0969111 A1 2000-01-05 - Metal Bolt having thixotropic properties and process for ist production

Title (en)

Metal Bolt having thixotropic properties and process for ist production

Title (de)

Metallbolzen mit thixotropen Eigenschaften und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Boulon métallique ayant des propriétés thixotropes et son procédé de fabrication

Publication

EP 0969111 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98810591 A

Priority

EP 98810591 A

Abstract (en)

The cross section of a metal bolt differs from a circular cross section. During heating of the bolt, for attaining a thixotropic state, the difference between its lowest core temperature and its highest surface temperature is smaller than the corresponding difference of a round bolt with the same cross-sectional area. Producing the bolt includes casting of a continuous billet with a noncircular cross section.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Herstellung von Metallbolzen mit thixotropen Eigenschaften für die Weiterverarbeitung im thixotropen Zustand wird aus einer Metallschmelze ein Strang mit einem thixotropen Gefüge gegossen, der gegossene Strang zu Bolzen abgelängt und die Bolzen werden zur Einstellung des thixotropen Zustandes vor der Weiterverarbeitung aufgeheizt. Der Strang wird mit einem von der kreisrunden Form abweichenden Querschnitt gegossen und beim Aufheizen der Bolzen zum thixotropen Zustand wird die sich zwischen der tiefsten Temperatur im Kern und der höchsten Temperatur an der Oberfläche des Bolzens einstellende Temperaturdifferenz im Vergleich zu einem Bolzen mit kreisrundem Querschnitt bei gleicher Querschnittsfläche unter gleichen Aufheizbedingungen kleiner gehalten bzw. nach kürzerer Aufheizzeit erreicht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 21/00; B22D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/00 (2006.01); C22C 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/005 (2013.01); B22D 11/00 (2013.01); B22D 11/009 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

[X] WO 9803686 A1 19980129 - UNIV MELBOURNE [AU], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969111 A1 20000105; EP 0969111 B1 20020424; AT 216734 T 20020515; DE 59803922 D1 20020529

INPADOC legal status

2005-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2004-04-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040227

2004-02-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-01-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040101

2003-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030630

2003-06-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030127

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020703

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020625

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020619

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-06-18 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020618

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803922

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-29

2002-04-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-04-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 216734

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010222

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI