Global patent index - EP 0969125 A1

EP 0969125 A1 2000-01-05 - Process for bringing zinc into solution in a ZnNi-electrolyte

Title (en)

Process for bringing zinc into solution in a ZnNi-electrolyte

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Lösen von Zink in einem ZnNi-Elektrolyten

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la dissolution du Zinc dans un électrolyte de ZnNi

Publication

EP 0969125 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99112486 A

Priority

DE 19829768 A

Abstract (en)

Zinc granules are dissolved in a weakly acidic ZnNi electrolyte while uniformly passing fine air bubbles through the bulk granules. An Independent claim is also included for a process for dissolving zinc granules in a weakly acidic ZnNi electrolyte of pH above 1.6 involving uniform passage of fine air bubbles through the bulk granules.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Lösen von Zink aus Zinkgranalien in einem schwachsauren ZnNi-Elektrolyten mit einem pH-Wert von > 1,6. Kennzeichen der Erfindung ist, daß während des Lösungsvorgangs eine Zinkgranalienschüttung feinperlig von Luft gleichmäßig durchströmt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 21/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 21/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 21/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [Y] US 5162555 A
  • [A] US 5609747 A
  • [Y] KAMMERECK H. E.A.: "Neues Elektrolytisches Verfahren zur Zinc-Nickel-Beschichtung von Feinblech" STAHL UND EISEN, Bd. 109, Nr. 6, 28. M{rz 1989 (1989-03-28), Seiten 67-72, XP002116008

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969125 A1 20000105; EP 0969125 B1 20020605; AT 218630 T 20020615; DE 19829768 C1 20000427; ES 2177172 T3 20021201

INPADOC legal status

2005-02-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030702

2004-07-01 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2004-02-18 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2004-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *THYSSENKRUPP STAHL A.G.

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-08-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030819

- Year of fee payment: 05

2003-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030730

- Year of fee payment: 05

2003-07-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030702

2003-07-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177172

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020830

2002-08-19 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020819

- Year of fee payment: 04

2002-08-01 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020801

- Year of fee payment: 04

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59901594

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20020711

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 218630

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 20020615

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Format of ref. document F/P: P

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: THYSSENKRUPP STAHL AG

2001-09-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010806

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE ES GB

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991109

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES GB

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI