Global Patent Index - EP 0969129 A2

EP 0969129 A2 2000-01-05 - Combing segment for a round comb of a textile combing machine

Title (en)

Combing segment for a round comb of a textile combing machine

Title (de)

Kämmsegment für einen Rundkamm einer textilen Kämm-Maschine

Title (fr)

Segment de peignage pour un peigne circulaire d'une machine textile de peignage

Publication

EP 0969129 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112331 A

Priority

DE 19829159 A

Abstract (en)

The comb segment, for the circular comb of a comber, has a clothing composed at least partially of needle strips (11). The needle strips (11) are secured to the carrier (12) which is locked to the comb segment (1) by screw bolts. The carrier (12) has shoulders with threaded drillings, where the outer contour of the shoulders matches the outer contour of the carrier bars so that, selectively, sawtooth stamped bolts (2) and/or the carrier (12) can be used for the needle strips (11). The needle strips (11) lie in grooves at the carrier (12), held by screw bolts through threaded drillings at an angle to the needle strips (11). The needle strips have an enlarged and pref. trapezoid foot, for mounting in a positive fit. A steel strip to distribute pressure is between the foot zones of the needle strips (11) and the screw bolts. The carrier (12) surface (15) between neighboring grooves is structured to give a projection with a larger radial extension at the trailing side of the grooves than at the leading side, in the direction (16) of comb rotation. The carrier (12) is a drawn profile.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Kämmsegment für einen Rundkamm ist vorgesehen, daß die Garnitur wenigstens teilweise aus Nadelstreifen (11) besteht, wobei die Nadelstreifen (11) an einem Tragelement (12) befestigt sind, welches seinerseits mit dem Kämmsegment (1) durch Schrauben (8) verbindbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 19/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/105 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3007245 A1 19810903 - STAEDTLER & UHL [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969129 A2 20000105; EP 0969129 A3 20010425; DE 19829159 A1 20000105

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020103

2002-02-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI