Global Patent Index - EP 0969136 A1

EP 0969136 A1 2000-01-05 - Laundry spinning machine particularly for a continuous batch washing machine

Title (en)

Laundry spinning machine particularly for a continuous batch washing machine

Title (de)

Wäsche-Zentrifuge, insbesondere für eine automatische Waschstrasse

Title (fr)

Machine d'essorage en particulier pour machine à laver en continu

Publication

EP 0969136 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99105718 A

Priority

DE 19829874 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829874A1] The position of the opening (20) can be altered by tilting the drum (16) in such a way that the opening and the drum are aligned to the side or downwards or in between the two positions for unloading. For spinning, the drum assumes an upright position with the opening pointing upwards.

Abstract (de)

Herkömmliche Wäsche-Zentrifugen übernehmen die Wäsche in einer schrägaufwärtsgerichteten Position, schleudern in derselben und schwenken zum Entladen schrägabwärts. Die Trommel (16) der erfindungsgemäßen Zentrifuge übernimmt die Wäsche in einer schrägaufwärtsgerichteten Position, schleudert in einer aufrechten Position und schwenkt von dort weiter in eine abwärtsgeneigte Position zum Entladen der Wäsche. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 49/06 (2006.01); D06F 95/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 95/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829874 A1 19990722; EP 0969136 A1 20000105; EP 0969136 B1 20021106; ES 2186268 T3 20030501; JP 2000024386 A 20000125; US 6260391 B1 20010717

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2004-10-27 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030321

2004-03-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-10-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: JENSEN-SENKING GMBH

- Effective date: 20030805

2003-07-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2186268 T3

2003-03-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030321

2003-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903295 20021212

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010109

2000-10-19 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990825

2000-10-11 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI