Global patent index - EP 0969149 A2

EP 0969149 A2 2000-01-05 - Safety barrier for road embankments

Title (en)

Safety barrier for road embankments

Title (de)

Leitplanken für Böschungswand

Title (fr)

Barrière de bord de route

Publication

EP 0969149 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99111184 A

Priority

IT PN980050 A

Abstract (en)

Sheet-steel road safety barrier with a profile of a New Jersey type, adapted to be installed on road embankments. The barrier is formed by modular elements, each one of which is constituted by a cover wall (10) made of folded sheet-steel and provided with a rear longitudinal reinforcing rib (11). The elements are fixed to vertical beams (12) that are stuck deep in the ground and are linked with each other by means of longitudinal tension rods (14). The beams are provided with plates (15, 16) in their portion sticking in the ground. The barrier is effectively anchored to the ground and provides a high extent of integration of its component parts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01F 8/00; E01F 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 8/00 (2006.01); E01F 15/04 (2006.01); E01F 15/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01F 15/085 (2013.01); E01F 8/0023 (2013.01); E01F 8/007 (2013.01); E01F 15/0476 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969149 A2 20000105; EP 0969149 A3 20020717; IT 1305514 B1 20010509; IT PN980050 A1 20000103; IT PN980050 D0 19980703

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030118

2003-05-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SISTEMA BARRIERE STRADALI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI