Global Patent Index - EP 0969155 A2

EP 0969155 A2 2000-01-05 - Process of replacement of subterranean pipes

Title (en)

Process of replacement of subterranean pipes

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Auswechseln im Erdreich verlegter Rohre

Title (fr)

Procédé de remplacement des conduits souterrains

Publication

EP 0969155 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112505 A

Priority

DE 19829667 A

Abstract (en)

The method of changing a buried pipeline has the old pipe overbored out by a drill carriage with a drill crown and an over bore rod. The old pipe is extracted by a twisting puller connected to the drill drive motor. The puller acts on the rear end of the old pipe in an insertion group. The puller is attached to the new pipe. The claims include a machine for performing the method.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Auswechseln im Erdreich verlegter Rohre, bei dem in dem Bereich zwischen einer Einziehbaugrube und einer Zielbaugrube (34) ein altes Rohr (32) entfernt und ein neus Rohr (31) an dessen Stelle eingezogen werden, indem durch eine Ziehvorrichtung (7) das alte Rohr (32) zur Zielbaugrube (34) hingezogen und in dieser zerstört und das neue Rohr (31) dem alten Rohr (32) folgend aus der Einziehbaugrube bis zur Zielbaugrube (34) gezogen werden, und das alte Rohr von der Zielbaugrube (34) aus mittels einer Bohrlafette (1) mit einer Bohrkrone (21) und einem Überbohrgestänge (20) überbohrt wird und das alte Rohr (32) durch Zurückfahren einer an dem Bohrmotor (12) befestigten Ziehvorrichtung (7) gezogen wird, wobei die Ziehvorrichtung (7) an dem hinteren Ende des alten Rohres in der Einziehbaugrube angreift und an der Ziehvorrichtung (7) das neue Rohr (31) befestigt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/20 (2006.01); E21B 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/28 (2013.01); E21B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3733463 C1 19890330 - KARL WEISS GMBH & CO

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829667 C1 19991118; EP 0969155 A2 20000105; EP 0969155 A3 20001206

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030322

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010510

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 03F 3/06 A, 7E 21B 7/20 B, 7E 21B 7/26 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI