Global patent index - EP 0969155 A3

EP 0969155 A3 2000-12-06 - Process of replacement of subterranean pipes

Title (en)

Process of replacement of subterranean pipes

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Auswechseln im Erdreich verlegter Rohre

Title (fr)

Procédé de remplacement des conduits souterrains

Publication

EP 0969155 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112505 A

Priority

DE 19829667 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19829667C1] The method of changing a buried pipeline has the old pipe overbored out by a drill carriage with a drill crown and an over bore rod. The old pipe is extracted by a twisting puller connected to the drill drive motor. The puller acts on the rear end of the old pipe in an insertion group. The puller is attached to the new pipe. The claims include a machine for performing the method

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03F 3/06; E21B 7/20; E21B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/20 (2006.01); E21B 7/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/28 (2013.01); E21B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829667 C1 19991118; EP 0969155 A2 20000105; EP 0969155 A3 20001206

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030322

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010510

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 03F 3/06 A, 7E 21B 7/20 B, 7E 21B 7/26 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI