Global Patent Index - EP 0969158 A2

EP 0969158 A2 2000-01-05 - Roof covering system

Title (en)

Roof covering system

Title (de)

Dacheindeckungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de recouvremont de toiture

Publication

EP 0969158 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830355 A

Priority

IT TO980581 A

Abstract (en)

Roof covering system comprising a number of modular elements each formed by a plate (1; 11) having at least two adjacent sides with respective edges (1a, 1b; 11a) bent in the same direction perpendicularly to the plate plane and forming, in correspondence of the corner comprised between these sides, an integral gutter (2, 3; 4). Each of the bent edges (1a, 1b; 11a) is designed to be frontally coupled with a corresponding edge bent in the opposite direction of an adjacent modular element. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/18; E04D 1/06; E04D 1/08; E04D 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/18 (2006.01); E04D 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/125 (2013.01); E04D 1/18 (2013.01); E04D 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969158 A2 20000105; EP 0969158 A3 20010418; IT TO980581 A1 20000103; IT TO980581 D0 19980702

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

2002-01-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010727

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI