Global Patent Index - EP 0969158 A3

EP 0969158 A3 2001-04-18 - Roof covering system

Title (en)

Roof covering system

Title (de)

Dacheindeckungssystem

Title (fr)

Système de recouvremont de toiture

Publication

EP 0969158 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99830355 A

Priority

IT TO980581 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0969158A2] Roof covering system comprising a number of modular elements each formed by a plate (1; 11) having at least two adjacent sides with respective edges (1a, 1b; 11a) bent in the same direction perpendicularly to the plate plane and forming, in correspondence of the corner comprised between these sides, an integral gutter (2, 3; 4). Each of the bent edges (1a, 1b; 11a) is designed to be frontally coupled with a corresponding edge bent in the opposite direction of an adjacent modular element. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 1/18; E04D 1/06; E04D 1/08; E04D 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/18 (2006.01); E04D 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 1/125 (2013.01); E04D 1/18 (2013.01); E04D 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969158 A2 20000105; EP 0969158 A3 20010418; IT TO980581 A1 20000103; IT TO980581 D0 19980702

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020301

2002-01-09 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

2002-01-09 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 20010727

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI