Global Patent Index - EP 0969159 A2

EP 0969159 A2 2000-01-05 - Covering for building

Title (en)

Covering for building

Title (de)

Gebäudehülle

Title (fr)

Couverture de bâtiment

Publication

EP 0969159 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120233 A

Priority

  • CH 142097 A
  • EP 98810303 A

Abstract (en)

Bolt-shaped fixture devices (41) firmly connect the retainers (39) with the sub-construction (13,17,23,25). Profile plates (35) preferably on both sides have an indentation (51) for accommodation of retainer feet (37) and/or heads of the bolt-shaped fixture components (41), and which are located in the same plane on the sub-construction as the retainers. The roof incorporates step-proof heat insulation (25), preferably mineral fibre plates with a sub-layer with lower lambda value and a load-distributing upper layer with increased space weight. A steam seal (23) is provided, formed by elastomer bitumen strips.

Abstract (de)

Eine Gebäudehülle, z.B. ein Metallfalz-Warmdach (11) mit reissfesten, klebeaktiven Elastomerbitumenbahnen als Dampfsperre (23), trittfesten und wasserabweisenden Steinwollplatten mit einer Zweischichtcharakteristik als Wärmedämmung (25) und auf der Wärmedämmung (25) lastverteilend aufliegend einer Metallfalzeindeckung (35), wobei die Wärmedämmung (25) in gleichbleibender Dicke stossverlegt und darauf ein Modulband (29) mit masshaltiger Lochung gelegt wird. Die Halter (39) für die Profilbleche (35) werden auf die Lochung auf das Modulband (29) gesetzt und mit Schrauben (41) durch das Modulband (29) und die Wärmedämmung (25) hindurch mit dem tragenden Unterbau (13) verschraubt. Die Schaftlänge der Schrauben (41) ist auf die Stärke der Wärmedämmung (25) abgestimmt und sorgt für eine angemessene Vorspannung der Schrauben (41). Die Schrauben (41) können wegen eines die Einschraubtiefe begrenzenden Abschlusses des Gewindebereiches nicht überdreht werden. Mit einer Dichtungsscheibe (55), einer Kunststoffkappe (59) über dem Schraubenkopf (47) und durch den Edelstahl der Schrauben (41) werden Wärmebrücken minimiert. Für die Eindeckung werden Profilbleche (35) mit einer an den Falz (53) anschliessenden Sicke (51) zur Aufnahme von Halterfuss (37) und Befestigungsmittel (41) verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 13/16; E04D 3/362

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/36 (2006.01); E04D 3/362 (2006.01); E04D 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/3602 (2013.01); E04D 3/3603 (2013.01); E04D 3/362 (2013.01); E04D 13/165 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0854252 A2 19980722; EP 0854252 A3 19980729; EP 0854252 B1 20001004; AT 196789 T 20001015; AT 219810 T 20020715; AT 224493 T 20021015; DE 59800286 D1 20001109; DE 59804582 D1 20020801; DE 59805613 D1 20021024; EP 0969159 A2 20000105; EP 0969159 A3 20000223; EP 0969159 B1 20020918; EP 0969160 A2 20000105; EP 0969160 A3 20000223; EP 0969160 B1 20020626

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031101

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHNEIDER & CO. LEICHTBAUSYSTEME

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *FLUMROC A.G.

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-05-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0969159E

2003-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-04-09 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030409

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-12-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59805613 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 854252

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224493 T 20021015

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010628

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991011

2000-01-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 854252

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI LU NL

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI