Global patent index - EP 0969165 A1

EP 0969165 A1 2000-01-05 - Apparatus for lifting and handling sheet-material for covering ceilings

Title (en)

Apparatus for lifting and handling sheet-material for covering ceilings

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Heben und Manipulieren von Platten zum Verkleiden von Decken

Title (fr)

Appareil de levage et de manutention de plaques de matériau destinées notamment à la couverture de plafond

Publication

EP 0969165 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420132 A

Priority

FR 9808495 A

Abstract (en)

The apparatus for ceiling cover plates (2) comprises a vertical carrying structure (3). This structure receives a lower column (9a) of a telescopic mast and a support platform for a motor unit (11). The motor output shaft is connected to a vertical endless screw (13) guided inside the telescopic mast. The screw is coupled to a bearing unit (18) integral with the mast intermediate movable part (9b). The motor rotates the screw and linearly displaces the nut to drive the mast intermediate part and then the mast upper part (9c). Work and safety cables (16,17) are fixed to the mast components and to the carrying structure.

Abstract (fr)

L'appareil de levage et de manutention de plaques de matériau, est remarquable en ce qu'il comprend une structure portante verticale (3) agencée pour recevoir, d'une manière fixe, la colonne inférieure (9a) du mât télescopique, et une plate-forme support (10) d'un bloc moteur (11) associé par son arbre de sortie (11a) à une vis sans fin (13) disposée verticalement et guidée à l'intérieur du mât télescopique, et en ce que la vis sans fin est accouplée à un palier écrou (18) solidaire de l'élément intermédiaire mobile (9b) du mât télescopique, et en ce que un élément supérieur (9c) du mât est susceptible de s'engager dans l'élément intermédiaire (9b), et en ce que la mise en fonctionnement du bloc moteur entraîne la rotation de la vis sans fin (13) et le déplacement linéaire vertical du palier écrou (18) entraînant le déplacement de l'élément intermédiaire (9b) du mât, puis de l'élément supérieur (9c), et en ce que des câbles de travail et de sécurité (16 - 17) sont solidarisés auxdits éléments télescopiques du mât et à la structure portante pour assurer et contrôler lesdits déplacements des éléments mobiles du mât. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 21/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/1805 (2013.01); E04F 21/1811 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2538437 A1

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969165 A1 20000105; EP 0969165 B1 20040303; DE 69915177 D1 20040408; DE 69915177 T2 20050224; ES 2216470 T3 20041016; FR 2780428 A1 19991231; FR 2780428 B1 20000825

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150630

2016-04-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160229

2014-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140627

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69915177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110612

2013-04-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20130405

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110611

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100625

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100623

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2216470

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69915177

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040408

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI