Global patent index - EP 0969169 A1

EP 0969169 A1 2000-01-05 - Flat key for cylinder lock

Title (en)

Flat key for cylinder lock

Title (de)

Flachschüssel für Schliesszylinder

Title (fr)

Clef plate pour serrure cylindrique

Publication

EP 0969169 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99111822 A

Priority

DE 19829521 A

Abstract (en)

The key contains parallel, paracentric length direction grooves (A) which all have same the depth (A2). The groove flanks (A1) adjacent to the bottoms (A2) of the grooves diverge conically towards the open side of the groove, ending in radial sections at the bottom of the groove. At least one groove has a profiled region (1-20) on at least one of its flanks forming an extension of the groove in its width direction, resulting in a widened flank with concave and convex curved sections. An independent claim is also claimed for the barrel lock used in conjunction with the key, its length direction ribs and lands being correspondingly shaped to enable them to engage with the key grooves and flanks.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Flachschlüssel für Schließzylinder mit in Längsrichtung und parallel zueinander zwischen dem Schlüsselrücken (R) und der Schlüsselbrust (T) verlaufenden, von den Schlüsselbreitseiten (B1 und B2) ausgehenden, parazentrischen Längsnuten (A) sind die Längsnuten (A) sämtlich gleich tief. Ihr Nutgrund (A2) hält einen gleichen Abstand (a) von der Längsmittelebene (M) ein. Die Flanken (A1) der Längsnuten (A) sind zumindest benachbart zum Nutgrund (A2) konisch zur Öffnungsseite hin auseinanderlaufend angeordnet und schließen über Radien an den Nutgrund (A2) an. Mindestens eine Längsnut (A) weist auf mindestens einer ihrer Flanken (A1) eine bis zur benachbarten Schlüsselbreitseite (B1; B2) sich erstreckende Längsnuterweiterung (1, 2 ... bis 10 und 11, 12 ... bis 20) auf. Die so erweiterte Flanke (A1) hat einen konkaven und einen sich anschließenden konvex gekrümmten Abschnitt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 19/00; E05B 15/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/00 (2006.01); E05B 19/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 19/0029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19829521 A1 19990304; DE 19829521 C2 20001214; EP 0969169 A1 20000105

INPADOC legal status

2001-08-22 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20010623

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010411

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

2000-01-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991124

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES IT LI NL

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI