Global Patent Index - EP 0969173 A2

EP 0969173 A2 2000-01-05 - Furniture hinge

Title (en)

Furniture hinge

Title (de)

Möbelscharnier

Title (fr)

Charnière de meuble

Publication

EP 0969173 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99108903 A

Priority

DE 29811793 U

Abstract (en)

The body stop part is held at least at one position on an installation plate (18) fixed to the support wall of a furniture body against being lifted away. The fixture holding the support arm against being lifted away from the installation plate incorporates a pivot bearing arrangement with a pivot axis running parallel to the pivot axis of the link mechanism. The pivot bearing arrangement on the one hand has an intermediate plate (52) held on the installation plate and adjustable in a longitudinal direction and on the other hand link units (58) pivotably linked to the support arm. The body inner end of the support arm is guided by a slide guide between the support arm and the installation plate, being movable parallel to the support wall surface and the installation plate.

Abstract (de)

Möbelscharnier, dessen über einen Gelenkmechanismus verschwenkbar mit einem Türflügel-Anschlagteil verbundener Korpus-Anschlagteil in Form eines Tragarms (16) auf einer an der Tragwand (12) des Korpus eines Möbelstücks befestigbaren Montageplatte (18) derart montierbar ist, daß er sowohl in Tragarm-Längsrichtung verschiebbar und - durch eine Schwenklager-Anordnung - auch um eine rechtwinklig zur Tragarm-Längsrichtung parallel zur Oberfläche der Tragwand (12) des Korpus verschwenkbar in wählbaren Einstellungen festlegbar gehaltert ist. Die Schwenklager-Anordnung weist einen einerseits verschwenkbar an einer in Längsrichtung verstellbar auf der Montageplatte (18) gehalterten Zwischenplatte (52) und andererseits verschwenkbar am Tragarm (16) angelenkten Lenker (58) auf, wobei das korpusinnere Ende des Tragarms (16) durch eine zwischen dem Tragarm und der Montageplatte (18) ausgebildete Schiebeführung (40,50) parallel zur Tragwand-Oberfläche verschieblich auf der Montageplatte (18) geführt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 7/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/04 (2006.01); E05D 7/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 7/0407 (2013.01); E05D 7/0423 (2013.01); E05D 7/125 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3510442 C2 19940714

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811793 U1 19991118; AT 270740 T 20040715; EP 0969173 A2 20000105; EP 0969173 A3 20030319; EP 0969173 B1 20040707; ES 2221260 T3 20041216

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2009-07-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20080506

2009-02-27 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080505

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070505

2008-01-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070505

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-14 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070514

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-10 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070510

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-10 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060510

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050408

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2221260

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-08-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-07-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT

2004-07-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-12-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT ES GB IT

2003-04-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030210

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-03-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI