Global Patent Index - EP 0969174 A2

EP 0969174 A2 2000-01-05 - Improvements relating to closure members

Title (en)

Improvements relating to closure members

Title (de)

Verbesserungen bezüglich Verschlusselementen

Title (fr)

Améliorations relatives à des éléments de fermeture

Publication

EP 0969174 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99304018 A

Priority

GB 9811677 A

Abstract (en)

A drive transfer and locking mechanism for a closure member (15), said mechanism comprising a first arm (12) to be moved arcuately by drive means (11) for effecting pivotal opening and closing of an aperture by the closure member (15), and a second arm (14) to support the closure member (15). Detent means (20) are provided to interengage and interconnect the first and second arms (12,14), the detent means (20) being resiliently operable in a generally vertical direction under the inherent resiliency of at least the first arm (12). The mechanism additionally includes magnetic means (25) to provide a magnetic attractive force between magnetically permeable regions of the two arms (12,14) to aid the detent means (20) in holding said interengaged and interconnected condition of the first and second arms (12,14). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05F 15/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/12 (2006.01); E05F 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/611 (2013.01); E05F 15/603 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969174 A2 20000105; EP 0969174 A3 20020410; GB 2338986 A 20000112; GB 2338986 B 20020220; GB 9811677 D0 19980729

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021203

2003-02-06 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-04-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05F 15/12 A, 7E 05F 15/10 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI