Global Patent Index - EP 0969176 A2

EP 0969176 A2 2000-01-05 - Frameless glass-wing as the movable or fixed wing of a door, window, facade or glass wall

Title (en)

Frameless glass-wing as the movable or fixed wing of a door, window, facade or glass wall

Title (de)

Rahmenloser Glasflügel als beweglich gelagerter oder ortsfester Flügel einer Tür, eines Fensters oder einer Fassade oder Glaswand

Title (fr)

Vantail de verre sans cadre comme le vantail mobile ou fixe d'une porte, fenêtre, façade ou paroi de verre

Publication

EP 0969176 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112887 A

Priority

  • DE 19829733 A
  • DE 19901753 A

Abstract (en)

In the edge area of the glass sheets a support and/or edge termination component. In hte edge area of the sheets is a fixture part. The fixture part (4,7,8,9), at least sectionally, replaces the support and/or edge termination component (5). It preferably extends completely between the glass sheets.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung beschreibt eine Befestigungsvorrichtung für Beschlagteile (7, 8, 9) eines rahmenlosen Glasflügels (1) einer Tür oder eines Fensters. Der Glasflügel (1) weist zwei parallele, zueinander beabstandete Scheiben (1a, 1b) und einen am Außenbereich der Scheiben (1a, 1b) umlaufenden Abstandshalter (6) auf, welcher den Innenraum (1c) der Scheiben (1a, 1b) dicht umschließt. Der Abstandshalter (6) bildet im Außenbereich der Scheiben (1a, 1b) Freiräume zur Aufnahme eines Trage- und Randabschlußelements (5). Dieses Trage- und/oder Randabschlußelement (5) ist mit den Scheiben (1a, 1b) verklebt. Das Beschlagteil (7, 8, 9) ist ebenfalls in dem durch den Abstandshalter (6) gebildeten Freiraum zwischen den Scheiben (1a, 1b) aufgenommen. Im Bereich des Beschlagteils (7, 8, 9), z.B. eines Zapfenbandes (7) eines Türbandes (4) oder einer Verriegelung (9), ist das Trage- und/oder Randabschlußelement (5) ausgespart. Das Trage- und/oder Randabschlußelement (5) und das Beschlagteil (7, 8, 9) grenzen jeweils aneinander an und sind kraftschlüssig durch eine Befestigungsvorrichtung (71, 92, 100) mit Schraub- und/oder Klemmverbindung miteinander verbunden. Diese Befestigungsvorrichtung (71, 92, 100) bietet den Vorteil, daß keinerlei Durchgriffsbohrungen innerhalb der Glasscheiben (1a, 1b) zur Befestigung der Beschlagteile (7, 8, 9) erforderlich sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/02; E05B 9/08; E05D 5/00; E06B 3/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/02 (2006.01); E06B 3/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/025 (2013.01); E06B 3/6621 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4400196 C1 19950629 - TEMOTRANS BV [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969176 A2 20000105; EP 0969176 A3 20000119; EP 0969176 B1 20040609; AT 268858 T 20040615

INPADOC legal status


2017-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 268858 T

- Effective date: 20160703

2017-03-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-03-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160731

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150721

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150626

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-06-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140703

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041109

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: GEZE GMBH

- Free text: GEZE GMBH#REINHOLD-VOESTER-STRASSE 21-29#71229 LEONBERG (DE) -TRANSFER TO- GEZE GMBH#REINHOLD-VOESTER-STRASSE 21-29#71229 LEONBERG (DE)

2005-06-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050310

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-12 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-10-05 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-09-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-09-09 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040909

2004-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-07-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-07-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909671 P 20040715

2004-07-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040703

2004-06-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-06-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-06-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-09 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040609

2004-06-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-10-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEZE GMBH

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEZE GLAS DESIGN GMBH

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000209

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI