Global patent index - EP 0969179 A2

EP 0969179 A2 2000-01-05 - Lamella for a slatted blind

Title (en)

Lamella for a slatted blind

Title (de)

Lamelle für Lamellenjalousien

Title (fr)

Lamelle pour stores à lamelles

Publication

EP 0969179 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99107133 A

Priority

DE 29811539 U

Abstract (en)

The lamella consists of a long thin metal strip has perforations located in a longitudinal central zone. The cross sectional surface (F) of the holes and the spacing between adjacent holes varies. The cross sectional surface and the spacing of the holes is determined by a prespecified function of the x and y coordinates. The holes are arranged in longitudinal lines (12) which are parallel with the longitudinal edges of the lamella and where all the holes along one line have the same cross section.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Lamelle für Lamellenjalousien angegeben, bestehend aus einem länglichen, dünnen Metallstreifen, der mindestens bereichsweise ein Lochraster, und gegebenenfalls in einer in Längsrichtung verlaufenden Mittenzone Durchbrüche aufweist. Die Lamelle ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Querschnittsfläche der Löcher und/oder der Abstand benachbarter Löcher in vorgegebener Weise auf dem Metallstreifen variiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/386

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/386 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/386 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 9411372 U1

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811539 U1 19991111; EP 0969179 A2 20000105; EP 0969179 A3 20020102

INPADOC legal status

2005-09-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050301

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: HUEPPELUX SONNENSCHUTZSYSTEME GMBH & CO. KG

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030707

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI