Global patent index - EP 0969180 A2

EP 0969180 A2 2000-01-05 - Tubular motor reducer for winding roller shutters and sunblinds integrated with anti-fall device

Title (en)

Tubular motor reducer for winding roller shutters and sunblinds integrated with anti-fall device

Title (de)

Rohrmotor mit Getriebe mit eingebauter Fallbremse zum Wickeln von Rolläden und Rollos

Title (fr)

Moto-réducteur tubulaire avec frein anti-chute intégré pour l'enroulement de volets et stores roulants

Publication

EP 0969180 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99830391 A

Priority

IT AN980036 U

Abstract (en)

The present invention relates to a tubular motor reducer for winding roller shutters integrated with an anti-fall device, of inertial type, located between the adapter that drags the roller shutter winding shaft into rotation and the sleeve which houses the epicyclic reduction gear of the tubular motor reducer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/84; E06B 9/72

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/72 (2006.01); E06B 9/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/72 (2013.01); E06B 9/84 (2013.01); E06B 2009/725 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969180 A2 20000105; EP 0969180 A3 20020911; EP 0969180 B1 20040506; DE 69916934 D1 20040609; DE 69916934 T2 20050428; ES 2221346 T3 20041216; IT 244858 Y1 20020314; IT AN980036 U1 20000103; IT AN980036 V0 19980703

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070623

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070623

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070622

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070622

2006-08-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060821

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060628

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060627

- Year of fee payment: 08

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2005-04-06 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-02-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2221346

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69916934

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20040609

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-07-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-05-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI