Global patent index - EP 0969198 A2

EP 0969198 A2 2000-01-05 - Device for flushing a charcoal canister and for leak testing of a vehicle engine fuel tank installation connected to said canister

Title (en)

Device for flushing a charcoal canister and for leak testing of a vehicle engine fuel tank installation connected to said canister

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spülen einer Aktivkohlefalle und zur zeitweiligen Dichtheitsprüfung einer mit dieser verbundenen Brennstofftankanlage einer Fahrzeug-Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour rincer un filtre à charbon actif et pour tester l'étanchéité d'une installation de réservoir à carburant pour moteur de véhicule connectée à ce filtre

Publication

EP 0969198 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99105365 A

Priority

DE 19829585 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a controllable valve (8) in a line (7) between the engine (4) and the air pump (6) and another controllable valve in a line (9) between the active carbon trap (2) and atmosphere. The latter valve is bypassed by a bypass line (11) contg. an aperture (12) and a non-return valve (13) that closes in the direction of the atmosphere.

Abstract (de)

Eine bekannte Vorrichtung weist den Nachteil auf, daß eine mit ihr ausgestattete Brennkraftmaschine fehlerhaft läuft. Hiergegen sieht die neue Vorrichtung vor, daß in einer Leitung (7) zwischen der Brennkraftmaschine (4) und der Luftpumpe (6) ein ansteuerbares Ventil (8) und in einer Leitung (9) zwischen Aktivkohlefalle (2) und Atmosphäre ein ansteuerbares Ventil (10) bestehen, wobei letzteres Ventil (10) von einer Umgehungsleitung (11) umgangen wird, in der eine Blende (12) und ein in Richtung Atmosphäre schließendes Rückschlagventil (13) angeordnet sind. Damit ist eine mit der Vorrichtung ausgestattete Brennkraftmaschine ohne Fehler zu betreiben. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/08 (2013.01); F02M 25/0818 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969198 A2 20000105; EP 0969198 A3 20000705; EP 0969198 B1 20030820; DE 19829585 A1 20000105; ES 2201585 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100316

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090525

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060322

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070317

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070317

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070316

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070316

2006-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2201585

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031029

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906641

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021016

2002-10-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-18 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990316

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI