Global patent index - EP 0969208 A1

EP 0969208 A1 2000-01-05 - Diaphragm pump

Title (en)

Diaphragm pump

Title (de)

Membranpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à membrane

Publication

EP 0969208 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99401590 A

Priority

FR 9808224 A

Abstract (en)

The pump uses a double acting actuator (18) to which a membrane(19) is attached. The pump expels by pressurising a number of chambers (15,16,17) and material is admitted to the pump by pressurising a first chamber (15) with auxiliary chambers (16,17) being at atmospheric pressure.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne une pompe à membrane qui comprend un mécanisme de commande entièrement pneumatique, ce mécanisme de commande comportant un vérin double effet (18) auquel est reliée une membrane (19), le refoulement étant obtenu par la mise en pression de plusieurs chambres (15, 16, 17), l'admission étant obtenue par la mise en pression d'une première chambre (15), les autres chambres (16, 17) étant à la pression atmosphérique. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/18 (2006.01); B41J 2/175 (2006.01); B41J 2/185 (2006.01); F04B 9/125 (2006.01); F04B 43/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 9/1253 (2013.01); F04B 43/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969208 A1 20000105; EP 0969208 B1 20041020; AU 3582199 A 20000113; CA 2276848 A1 19991229; CN 1144950 C 20040407; CN 1239189 A 19991222; DE 69921238 D1 20041125; DE 69921238 T2 20051027; ES 2229643 T3 20050416; FR 2780451 A1 19991231; FR 2780451 B1 20020208; JP 2000034981 A 20000202; US 6267568 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status

2006-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20050627

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050625

2006-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060103

2005-10-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050721

2005-06-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050627

2005-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2005-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050625

2005-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2229643

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-03-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050209

2004-11-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69921238

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20041125

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-10-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2004-10-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030227

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI