Global Patent Index - EP 0969212 A2

EP 0969212 A2 2000-01-05 - Back pressure check valve

Title (en)

Back pressure check valve

Title (de)

Vorspann-Rückschlagventil

Title (fr)

Valve anti-retour de précontrainte

Publication

EP 0969212 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99110208 A

Priority

DE 19829232 A

Abstract (en)

The pilot piston (40) is movable via a pilot pressure connection (14) and raises the stop component (30) from its seat (20). On the pilot piston an intermediate piston is provided, effecting a pressure drop at a cross-section narrowed formation (22) and movable with the force of at least one screw spring (50) relatively to the pilot piston. The cross-section narrowed formation is arranged in the conduit between the stop component and the second connection (12). The intermediate piston is fitted inside the pilot piston.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein hydraulisch mittels eines Pilotkolbens (40) entsperrbares Rückschlagventil mit einem ersten Anschluß (10), einem auf einem Sitz (20) dichtenden Sperrelement (30) und einem in Sperrichtung dahinter angeordneten zweiten Anschluß (12), wobei der Pilotkolben (40) über einen Pilotdruck-Anschluß (14) bewegbar ist und das Sperrelement (30) von seinem Sitz (20) abhebt, wobei am Pilotkolben (40) ein einen Druckabfall an einer Querschnittsverengung (22) bewirkender, mittels einer Kraft relativ zum Pilotkolben (40) bewegbarer Zwischenkolben (42) vorgesehen ist und wobei die Querschnittsverengung (22) in der Leitung zwischen dem Sperrelement (30) und dem zweiten Anschluß (12) angeordnet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/01 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969212 A2 20000105; EP 0969212 A3 20000405; DE 19829232 C1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011201

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT NL SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI