Global patent index - EP 0969212 A3

EP 0969212 A3 2000-04-05 - Back pressure check valve

Title (en)

Back pressure check valve

Title (de)

Vorspann-Rückschlagventil

Title (fr)

Valve anti-retour de précontrainte

Publication

EP 0969212 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99110208 A

Priority

DE 19829232 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0969212A2] The pilot piston (40) is movable via a pilot pressure connection (14) and raises the stop component (30) from its seat (20). On the pilot piston an intermediate piston is provided, effecting a pressure drop at a cross-section narrowed formation (22) and movable with the force of at least one screw spring (50) relatively to the pilot piston. The cross-section narrowed formation is arranged in the conduit between the stop component and the second connection (12). The intermediate piston is fitted inside the pilot piston.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/01

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/01 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969212 A2 20000105; EP 0969212 A3 20000405; DE 19829232 C1 20000518

INPADOC legal status

2002-07-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011201

2000-12-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT NL SE

2000-08-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000530

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI