Global Patent Index - EP 0969246 A2

EP 0969246 A2 2000-01-05 - Headlamp device of the projection type for motor vehicles

Title (en)

Headlamp device of the projection type for motor vehicles

Title (de)

Scheinwerferanordnung nach dem Projektionstyp für Kraftfahrzeuge

Title (fr)

Phare du type projecteur pour véhicules automobiles

Publication

EP 0969246 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111394 A

Priority

DE 19829343 A

Abstract (en)

The headlamp arrangement has one or more light sources, at least one reflector and a lens (1). The optically active, i.e. directly illuminated lens diameter is extended by an edge region (2a) that is not optically active or not directly illuminated by focus light. The edge region is in the form of an annular element applied or attached to the lens.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Scheinwerfer nach dem Projektionstyp für Kraftfahrzeuge, mit einem oder mehreren Leuchtmitteln, mindestens einem Reflektor sowie einer Linse gemäß Oberbegriff des Patentanspruches 1. Um bei einem Scheinwerfer dieser Art eine optische Vergrößerung des Scheinwerferdesigns ohne den Bauraum als solches zu vergrößern zu erreichen, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgeschlagen, daß der optisch aktive d.h. direktausgeleuchtete Linsendurchmesser um ein optisch nicht aktives bzw. nicht direkt vom Fokuslicht ausgeleuchteten Randbereich (2a,2b,2c,2d) erweitert ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 5/04; F21V 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 5/04 (2006.01); F21S 8/12 (2006.01); F21V 5/00 (2006.01); F21V 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1216 (2013.01); F21S 48/1258 (2013.01); F21S 48/1283 (2013.01); F21S 48/155 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 3516813 A1 19861113 - HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969246 A2 20000105; EP 0969246 A3 20011017; EP 0969246 B1 20070411; AT 359482 T 20070515; DE 19829343 A1 20000105; DE 59914287 D1 20070524

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080606

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-08-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070411

2008-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080114

2007-11-07 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-09-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070911

2007-08-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-07-22 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070722

2007-07-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070711

2007-05-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914287 P 20070524

2007-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2007-04-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 5/04 20060101AFI20060911BHEP

2006-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21V 17/00 20060101ALI20060911BHEP

2006-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F21S 8/12 20060101ALI20060911BHEP

2006-08-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20051222

2002-07-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2002-06-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020417

2001-10-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI