Global patent index - EP 0969251 A2

EP 0969251 A2 2000-01-05 - Ignition apparatus for boiler

Title (en)

Ignition apparatus for boiler

Title (de)

Zündvorrichtung für Heizkessel

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'allumage pour chaudière

Publication

EP 0969251 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99305190 A

Priority

KR 19980011670 U

Abstract (en)

An ignition apparatus for a boiler capable of preventing a wrong operation of a control circuit is provided. In the ignition apparatus for a boiler, a sparking plug performs an igniting operation of the gas supplied into the burner. Spark plug has an insulator mounted to a back wall of the combustion chamber and two leads extending from both ends of the insulator. A high voltage transformer generates a high voltage necessary to ignite the burner and applies the high voltage to the spark plug. Two connecting terminals are formed at one end of high voltage transformer. Two leads are inserted into two connecting terminals. A driver is mounted to the control circuit in such a way that the driver is connected to the spark plug and drives the spark plug. A wire connects the high voltage transformer and the driver. A power supply is mounted to a control circuit in such a way that the power supply is electrically connected to the driver and supplies power to the driver in order to control an operation of the driver. According to the ignition apparatus, discharge noise of a high voltage generated in a high voltage cable according to the conventional ignition apparatus does not affect the control circuit to thereby prevent a wrong operation of the control circuit. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23Q 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23Q 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23Q 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4863372 A

Citation (search report)

[X] EP 0801267 A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969251 A2 20000105; EP 0969251 A3 20010926

INPADOC legal status

2004-02-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031203

2003-07-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAEWOO GASBOILER CO., LTD.

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT NL

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020321

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI