Global Patent Index - EP 0969253 A2

EP 0969253 A2 2000-01-05 - Cooker kit assembly

Title (en)

Cooker kit assembly

Title (de)

Bausatz für Gargeräte

Title (fr)

Kit d'assemblage d'un appareil de cuisson

Publication

EP 0969253 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99303991 A

Priority

IL 12508398 A

Abstract (en)

A cooking range kit for assembly to a horizontal plate (12) includes a plurality of heater units (14,32), energy conduits (16,34) connectable to said heater units (14,32), and controls for said heater units (14,32), said plate (12) being provided with apertures (22) for the insertion therein of part of said heater unit (14,32), an upper surface of said heater unit arranged to support a cooking vessel projecting, when assembled to said plate, above the upper surface of said plate (12), said energy connections when assembled being located below said plate (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 1/00; F24C 3/08; F24C 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/102 (2013.01); F24C 3/085 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910789 U1 19990909; CN 2386346 Y 20000705; EP 0969253 A2 20000105; EP 0969253 A3 20010103; IL 125083 D0 19990126

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI