Global Patent Index - EP 0969253 A3

EP 0969253 A3 2001-01-03 - Cooker kit assembly

Title (en)

Cooker kit assembly

Title (de)

Bausatz für Gargeräte

Title (fr)

Kit d'assemblage d'un appareil de cuisson

Publication

EP 0969253 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99303991 A

Priority

IL 12508398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CN2386346Y] The utility model relates to a cooker, particularly a disperse assembly of a structure body. The utility model is used as a household cooker. The disperse assembly can be arranged on a table top to be drilled for shaping after the completion of assembly. A series disperse assembly also comprises a surface supporting component, which is favorable for a cooker vessel to be fixed on a plate of the table top.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 1/00; F24C 3/08; F24C 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/102 (2013.01); F24C 3/085 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29910789 U1 19990909; CN 2386346 Y 20000705; EP 0969253 A2 20000105; EP 0969253 A3 20010103; IL 125083 D0 19990126

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010704

2001-10-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI