Global patent index - EP 0969255 A2

EP 0969255 A2 2000-01-05 - Installation with a heat pump and an accumulator

Title (en)

Installation with a heat pump and an accumulator

Title (de)

Anlage mit einer Wärmepumpe und einem Speicher

Title (fr)

Installation avec pompe à chaleur et accumulateur

Publication

EP 0969255 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111775 A

Priority

  • DE 19829334 A
  • DE 19925827 A

Abstract (en)

The compressor (22), high temperature heat transmitter (24), expansion device (26) and low temperature heat transmitter (28) are all joined together in a circuit, through which carbon dioxide flows as work medium. The high temperature heat transmitter of the heat pump (18) is arranged in the floor-side area (30) of the temperature-layered accumulator (20). It is a counterflow heat transmitter in a container. A rise pipe (36) connects to the upper side of the container (34) and extends with an outlet (38) to the upper side area (40) of the accumulator. The high temperature heat transmitter is preferably formed as a lamella tube bundle heat transmitter. In the rise pipe is a device for regulating the volume flow of the storage fluid (32) to be heated.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Anlage (16) mit einer Wärmepumpe (18) und einem ein Speicherfluid (32) enthaltenden Speicher (20) beschrieben. Die Wärmepumpe (18) weist einen Verdichter (22), einen Hochtemperatur-Wärmeübertrager (24), eine Expansionseinrichtung (26) und einen Niedertemperatur-Wärmeübertrager (28) auf, die in einem Kreis miteinander verbunden und von Kohlendioxid als Arbeitsmittel durchflossen sind. Der Hochtemperatur-Wärmeübertrager (24) der Wärmepumpe (18) ist im bodenseitigen Bereich (30) des temperaturgeschichteten Speichers (20) angeordnet. Der Hochtemperatur-Wärmeübertrager (24) ist ein Gegenstrom-Wärmeübertrager, der in einem Behälter (34) vorgesehen ist. An den Behälter (34) schließt oberseitig strömungstechnisch ein Steigrohr (36) an, das sich mit einem Steigrohraustritt (38) zum oberseitigen Bereich (40) des Speichers (20) erstreckt. Der Hochtemperatur-Wärmeübertrager (24) ist vorzugsweise als Lamellenrohrbündel-Wärmeübertrager (42) ausgebildet. Im Steigrohr (36) kann zur Regelung des Volumenstromes des zu erwärmenden Speicherfluides (32) eine Regelungseinrichtung (50) vorgesehen sein. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24H 4/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 4/04 (2006.01); F25B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/0015 (2013.01); F24H 4/04 (2013.01); F24H 9/0021 (2013.01); F25B 9/008 (2013.01); F25B 2309/061 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969255 A2 20000105; EP 0969255 A3 20020710; EP 0969255 B1 20040915; AT 276496 T 20041015; DE 19925827 C1 20010118

INPADOC legal status

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100618

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090627

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090618

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050618

2006-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050618

2005-06-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050618

2005-04-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-02-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050110

2004-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FIAMMENGHI-FIAMMENGHI

2004-10-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI

2004-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030521

2003-05-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-04-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CH FR GB IT LI

2003-02-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021212

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI