Global patent index - EP 0969259 A2

EP 0969259 A2 2000-01-05 - Dryer with air circulation

Title (en)

Dryer with air circulation

Title (de)

Umlufttrockner

Title (fr)

Sécheur à circulation d'air

Publication

EP 0969259 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111834 A

Priority

  • DE 19829134 A
  • DE 19915923 A

Abstract (en)

The dryer for textile piecegoods, using recirculating air, has a shaft (31) for the bypass flap (30) in the lower half of the bypass opening (29). The bypass flap (30) has a longer (32) and a shorter (33) leg. The length of the longer leg (32) is at least equal to the gap between the shaft (31) and the upper edge (34) of the deflection plate (24). To set the flap (30) into the bypass setting, the bypass opening (29) is divided into two sections. One part is a flow section (37) linked to the pressure chamber (25) and a suction section (38) is connected to the distribution chamber (26). The dimensions of the opening of the flow section (37) to the opening of the suction section (38) are in a ratio of 2.5 to 5.0. The bypass flap (30) is at an acute angle to the vertical, with its upper end offset towards the distribution chamber (25). The shaft (31) for the bypass flap (30) is higher than the upper edge (34) of the deflection plate (24). Limit stops (40,41) with spring plates (42,43) are at the upper and lower ends of the bypass opening (29).

Abstract (de)

Bei Umlufttrocknern, in denen Warenbahnen kontinuierlich getrocknet werden, besteht bei Stillstand der Warenbahn das Problem der Übertrocknung. Zur Vermeidung von Übertrocknung ist es bekannt, Behandlungsmittel über eine mit einer Bypassklappe versehene Bypassöffnung direkt in einen Rückströmraum zu führen. Außerdem sind an Düsenkasten angeordnete Elemente bekannt, durch die wahlweise Bypassöffnungen oder Zuströmöffnungen der Düsenkästen verschlossen werden können. Die in der Hauptanmeldung DE 198 29 134 gezeigte Bypassklappe führt aufgrund der Anordnung eines Umlenkbleches zu Turbulenzen. Diese Turbulenzen sollen durch geeignete konstruktive Maßnahmen verringert werden. Erfindungsgemäß wird eine Bypassklappe (30) mit einer außermittig angeordneten Welle (31) versehen. Die Welle (31) teilt die Bypassklappe (30) in einen längeren Schenkel (32) und in einen kürzeren Schenkel (33). Die Länge des längeren Schenkels (32) entspricht dem Abstand zwischen der Welle (31) und einer Oberkante (34) des Umlenkbleches (24). Die Welle (31) ist im unteren Bereich der Bypassöffnung (29) angeordnet. In Bypaßstellung teilt die Bypassklappe (30) die Bypassöffnung (29) in einen größeren Durchströmabschnitt (37) und einen kleineren Ansaugabschnitt (38). Durch das entlang der Bypassklappe (30) durch den Durchströmabschnitt (37) strömende Behandlungsmittel wird in der Ansaugöffnung (38), die mit den Zuströmöffnungen (14) der Düsenkästen (7) verbunden ist ein Unterdruck erzeugt. Behandlungsmittel wird von den Düsenkästen (7) und damit von der Warenbahn (1) abgezogen. Dadurch ist ein sicherer Betrieb im Bypass gewährleistet. Umlufttrockner z.B. für textile Warenbahnen, Papier- und Folienbahnen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 13/10; F26B 21/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 21/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969259 A2 20000105; EP 0969259 A3 20010912; EP 0969259 B1 20040915; PT 969259 E 20041231

INPADOC legal status

2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080619

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070104

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080623

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070618

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-06-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070620

- Year of fee payment: 09

2007-04-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070228

2007-02-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060619

2007-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES;SEARCHED & EXAMINED PATENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

- Free Format Text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20061219

2006-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061219

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 08

2006-06-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060619

2005-12-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-09-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050616

2005-08-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-07-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-06-30 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050630

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-06-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Free Format Text: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH DE

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-06-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050613

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-06-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050610

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050531

- Year of fee payment: 07

2005-01-25 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20040404117

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2005-01-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-01-12 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLICATION

- Owner name: MOENUS TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2004-12-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041028

2004-10-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 59910491

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20041021

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT PT

2004-09-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-06-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP APPLICATION

- Owner name: BTM TEXTILMASCHINEN GMBH

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB GR IT PT

2002-05-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020312

2001-09-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB GR IT PT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI