Global Patent Index - EP 0969316 A2

EP 0969316 A2 2000-01-05 - Visible light absorbing polymer particles and photographic elements comprising them

Title (en)

Visible light absorbing polymer particles and photographic elements comprising them

Title (de)

Sichtbares-Licht absorbierende Polymerteilchen und diese enthaltende photographische Elemente

Title (fr)

Particules polymères absorbant la lumière visible et élèments photographiques les comprenant

Publication

EP 0969316 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99201942 A

Priority

US 10664098 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is a photographic element which includes a support, at least one silver halide light sensitive emulsion layer and an antihalation layer. The antihalation layer includes a hydrophilic binder and a polymer particle having a size greater than 0.01 mu m. The polymer particle is composed of a polymer derived from monomer A comprising ethylenically unsaturated monomers which form water insoluble homopolymers and monomer B comprising ethylenically unsaturated monomers which form water soluble homopolymers wherein monomer B is less than 10 weight percent of the polymer and a visible light absorbing dye.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G03C 1/825; C08J 3/20; G03C 1/835

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 3/12 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); G03C 1/005 (2006.01); G03C 1/825 (2006.01); G03C 1/835 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03C 1/825 (2013.01); G03C 1/005 (2013.01); G03C 1/835 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969316 A2 20000105; EP 0969316 A3 20000301; JP 2000066335 A 20000303

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050511

2005-03-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050118

2000-11-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000729

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI