Global patent index - EP 0969354 A3

EP 0969354 A3 2000-02-09 - Heat sink device for electronic devices

Title (en)

Heat sink device for electronic devices

Title (de)

Wärmesenke für elektronische Vorrichtungen

Title (fr)

Dissipateur de chaleur pour appareils électroniques

Publication

EP 0969354 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99112514 A

Priority

  • JP 18606398 A
  • JP 18763198 A
  • JP 18763698 A
  • JP 18764198 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0969354A2] A heat sink device for use in an electronic device for dissipating into the atmosphere outside a housing of the electronic device the heat generated by an electronic component disposed within the housing. The housing has a peripheral wall formed with a heat removal opening. A heat sink disposed within the housing comprises a metal body having a heat pipe portion, and a radiation fin attached to the body in the vicinity of the heat removal opening and opposed to the opening. The heat-generating electronic component, such as CPU, is held in contact with the metal body at a location away from the fin attached portion thereof. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 1/20; F28D 15/02; H05K 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 7/20 (2006.01); G06F 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 1/203 (2013.01); F28D 15/0233 (2013.01); G06F 2200/201 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [PXPA] WO 9906903 A1 19990211 - INTEL CORP [US]
  • [XA] US 4830100 A 19890516 - KATO SHUICHIRO [JP], et al
  • [XA] "Integrated heat pipe fan", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN., vol. 38, no. 12, December 1995 (1995-12-01), IBM CORP. NEW YORK., US, pages 531 - 532, XP000588228, ISSN: 0018-8689

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969354 A2 20000105; EP 0969354 A3 20000209; AU 3689699 A 20000120; AU 753320 B2 20021017; CA 2276795 A1 20000101; CN 1170466 C 20041006; CN 1242686 A 20000126; KR 20000011358 A 20000225; TW 479449 B 20020311; US 6115252 A 20000905

INPADOC legal status

2003-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030207

2002-11-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020926

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-02-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 06F 1/20 A, 7H 05K 7/20 B, 7F 28D 15/02 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI