Global patent index - EP 0969419 A2

EP 0969419 A2 2000-01-05 - Toll booth apparatus

Title (en)

Toll booth apparatus

Title (de)

Apparat für eine Mautstation

Title (fr)

Appareil pour station de péage

Publication

EP 0969419 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99201467 A

Priority

GB 9814240 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for speeding up the processing of customers passing through toll booths (1), includes a data entry device (8), located adjacent to a queuing area for customers waiting to pass through the toll booth. Customers may enter data, such as ticket numbers, into the device. A computer (2) in the toll booth performs preliminary processing on the data, e.g. by printing tickets, while the customer is still queuing, so that the amount of processing when the customer reaches the toll booth is reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/06 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969419 A2 20000105; EP 0969419 A3 20020619; AU 3237999 A 20000120; GB 9814240 D0 19980902

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUJITSU SERVICES LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 07B 15/00 A, 7G 07C 9/02 B, 7G 07C 11/00 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI