Global Patent Index - EP 0969420 A2

EP 0969420 A2 2000-01-05 - Method for secure transfer of service data to a terminal and arrangement for carrying out the same

Title (en)

Method for secure transfer of service data to a terminal and arrangement for carrying out the same

Title (de)

Verfahren zur sicheren Übertragung von Dienstdaten an ein Endgerät und Anordnung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Procédé pour sécuriser la transmission de données de service à un terminal et dispositif pour la mise en oeuvre de ce procédé

Publication

EP 0969420 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99250182 A

Priority

DE 19830055 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves preparing new postal rate table data (210) in data center, forming request data, communication (120) from the terminal involving transmitting request data to the data center requesting the new service data, receiving and storing the data. The method involves preparing new service data in a data center for future processing based on the data; forming request data for the service data; a first communication (120) from the terminal involving transmitting request data to the data center requesting the new service data, receiving and storing the data; a first communication (220) from the data center involving receiving the request data and transmitting the requested service data; a second communication (130) from terminal involving forming and transmitting data related to the valid service data to the data center; and a second communication (230) from the data center involving receiving and checking the further data and sending an OK signal to trigger registration of the service. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Das Verfahren zur sicheren Übertragung von Daten an ein Endgerät, insbesondere eine portoberechnenede Waage oder Frankiermaschine, umfaßt die Schritte, Bereitstellen (210) von neuen Portotariftabellendaten in der Datenzentrale für eine zukünftige Portoberechnung, Bilden (110) von Anforderungsdaten für Portotariftabellendaten und Kommunikation (120, 220) des Endgerätes mit einer Datenzentrale, um die neuen Portotariftabellendaten von der Datenzentrale anzufordern, zu empfangen und zu speichern sowie einer Kommunikation (130, 230), um eine Information über die gespeicherten Portotariftabellendaten zur Datenzentrale zu übermitteln und dort zu prüfen, bevor ein Senden einer OK-Meldung an das Endgerät erfolgt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 17/0008 (2013.01); G07B 17/00314 (2013.01); G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 17/00661 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00161 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00169 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00354 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0037 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00701 (2013.01); G07B 2017/0075 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00766 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00774 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830055 A1 19991230; DE 19830055 B4 20051013; DE 59913544 D1 20060727; EP 0969420 A2 20000105; EP 0969420 A3 20001213; EP 0969420 B1 20060614; US 7577617 B1 20090818

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130611

2014-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130630

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130611

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913544

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130611

2014-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120627

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120705

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120404

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20120622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-09-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

- Free text: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE) -TRANSFER TO- FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH#TRIFTWEG 21-26#16547 BIRKENWERDER (DE)

2007-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070315

2007-01-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060913

2006-07-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913544 P 20060727

2006-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ROTTMANN, ZIMMERMANN + PARTNER AG

2006-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-06-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA GMBH

2002-07-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FRANCOTYP-POSTALIA AG & CO. KG

2001-09-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010412

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI