Global Patent Index - EP 0969432 A3

EP 0969432 A3 2000-09-13 - System and method for detecting an intrusion and cap for hinge of window, door or the like

Title (en)

System and method for detecting an intrusion and cap for hinge of window, door or the like

Title (de)

System und Verfahren zur Einbruch-Erkennung und Aufsteckhülse für ein Scharnier eines Fensters, einer Tür oder dergleichen

Title (fr)

Système et procédé pour détecter une intrusion et capuchon pour charnière de fenêtre, porte ou similaire

Publication

EP 0969432 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112622 A

Priority

DE 19829703 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0969432A2] The system has a signal generator (17) whose signal can be directed at a signal deflection element (14) mounted on a door or window (4) and a signal reception element (18) for receiving the signal deflected by the signal deflection element. The deflection element deflects the signal to the reception element in a limited angular range of opening or closing of the door or window. Independent claims are also included for a method of detecting a break-in and for a mounting sleeve.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/08; G01V 8/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969432 A2 20000105; EP 0969432 A3 20000913

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-07-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-23 [D18W] WITHDRAWAL (DELETED)

2001-05-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20010310

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08B 13/08 A, 7G 01V 8/14 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI