Global Patent Index - EP 0969490 A3

EP 0969490 A3 2000-07-05 - Protective cap

Title (en)

Protective cap

Title (de)

Schutzkappe

Title (fr)

Capuchon protecteur

Publication

EP 0969490 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99112043 A

Priority

DE 29811828 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0969490A2] The cap (1) has an interior space shaped so the switch hold (4) is operated without any return torque. To operate the toggle of the switch, the cap is distorted so the hold can be turned about its angle or in both directions. The cap reforms itself when it is let loose and returns to its start position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 21/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/06 (2006.01); H01H 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 23/06 (2013.01); H01H 9/04 (2013.01); H01H 2009/048 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811828 U1 19980903; DE 59913991 D1 20070104; EP 0969490 A2 20000105; EP 0969490 A3 20000705; EP 0969490 B1 20061122

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-03-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150227

2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130622

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59913991

- Effective date: 20140101

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130703

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120820

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070823

2007-05-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913991 P 20070104

2006-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000801

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI