Global patent index - EP 0969551 A1

EP 0969551 A1 2000-01-05 - Add-on electrical assembly with light transmission means

Title (en)

Add-on electrical assembly with light transmission means

Title (de)

Elektrischer Zusatzzusamenbau mit Licht-Übertragungsmittel

Title (fr)

Assemblage électrique additionnel avec des moyens de transmission lumineuse

Publication

EP 0969551 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98109972 A

Priority

EP 98109972 A

Abstract (en)

An add-on electrical assembly (10) is provided for association with an electrical connector for receiving a complementary mating plug to a circuit board. The electrical connector may be a standard modular jack (12) including a connector housing (16) having a front face (18) with a receptacle (20) receiving the plug, a top wall (22), a rear wall (24) and a bottom face (26) adapted for mounting on the circuit board. A plurality of terminals each include one end extending into the receptacle for making electrical contact with a corresponding terminal on the plug and the other end (38) adapted to contact the circuit board. A separate LED assembly 10 is provided with housing (40) for mounting over the top and rear walls (22,24) of the connector housing. A light emitting device (46) is mounted on the LED housing (40) and is viewable through a front face (42a) thereof adjacent the receptacle (20). Conductors (50) extend from the light emitting device (46) through the LED housing (40) for connection to the circuit board. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 3/00; H01R 13/66; H01R 13/717

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 3/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/717 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/717 (2013.01); H01R 13/7172 (2013.01); H01R 13/7175 (2013.01); H01R 24/64 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969551 A1 20000105; DE 69803551 D1 20020314; DE 69803551 T2 20030123

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-02-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021227

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI