Global Patent Index - EP 0969552 A1

EP 0969552 A1 2000-01-05 - End cap for insulation piercing connectors

Title (en)

End cap for insulation piercing connectors

Title (de)

Endkappe für isolierungsdurchdringenden Verbinder

Title (fr)

Capuchon d'extrémité pour connecteur à percement d'isolation

Publication

EP 0969552 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99112511 A

Priority

  • EP 99112511 A
  • EP 98401663 A

Abstract (en)

An insulation piercing connector assembly (1) is provided with a sealing cap (8) mountable over the end of a cable (6) and subsequently insertable between clamping jaws (11, 13) of the connector. The assembled sealing cap (8) and end cable (6) are clamped prior to termination by retaining plates (38) for easier handling and more reliable termination. Insulation piercing contacts of the connector pierce through the body (32) of the sealing cap and insulation layer of the cable during termination. The sealing cap arrangement enables the cable to be inserted between the clamping jaws from a side (7) thereof which is particularly useful in confined spaces. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 4/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01); H01R 4/22 (2006.01); H01R 4/44 (2006.01); H01R 13/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2408 (2013.01); H01R 4/22 (2013.01); H01R 4/44 (2013.01); H01R 13/5216 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969552 A1 20000105; EP 0969552 B1 20021030

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-05-10 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69903693

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100728

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-10-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-04-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903693 20021205

2002-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-10-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI