Global patent index - EP 0969556 A2

EP 0969556 A2 2000-01-05 - Connector compatible for refusion and wave soldering

Title (en)

Connector compatible for refusion and wave soldering

Title (de)

Wellen-und Wiederaufschmelzlöten verträglicher Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur compatible pour soudure à vague et refusion

Publication

EP 0969556 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99500095 A

Priority

ES 9801749 U

Abstract (en)

The connector formed with a body noticeably prismatic and the combination of the two major lateral bases with the two minor lateral bases, having in the interior guiding means for a male connector formed with guiding walls, the first one formed by a thickening in the interior face of the major lateral base, whilst the second is formed with a small wall of little width, being provided in the lateral bases openings in which are the immobilization means of the female connector in the interior of said male connector. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2013.01); H01R 12/707 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 13/62944 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969556 A2 20000105; EP 0969556 A3 20010103; EP 0969556 B1 20060830; DE 69932974 D1 20061012; DE 69932974 T2 20070426; ES 1040584 U 19990416; ES 1040584 Y 19990816

INPADOC legal status

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070608

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070608

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT; NO LEGAL EFFECT FROM

2006-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Document Number: 69932974

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 20061012

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2006-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040913

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 9/00 A, 7H 01R 13/629 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI