Global Patent Index - EP 0969556 A3

EP 0969556 A3 2001-01-03 - Connector compatible for refusion and wave soldering

Title (en)

Connector compatible for refusion and wave soldering

Title (de)

Wellen-und Wiederaufschmelzlöten verträglicher Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur compatible pour soudure à vague et refusion

Publication

EP 0969556 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99500095 A

Priority

ES 9801749 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0969556A2] The connector formed with a body noticeably prismatic and the combination of the two major lateral bases with the two minor lateral bases, having in the interior guiding means for a male connector formed with guiding walls, the first one formed by a thickening in the interior face of the major lateral base, whilst the second is formed with a small wall of little width, being provided in the lateral bases openings in which are the immobilization means of the female connector in the interior of said male connector. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 9/00; H01R 13/629

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/629 (2013.01); H01R 12/707 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 13/62944 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969556 A2 20000105; EP 0969556 A3 20010103; EP 0969556 B1 20060830; DE 69932974 D1 20061012; DE 69932974 T2 20070426; ES 1040584 U 19990416; ES 1040584 Y 19990816

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2008-05-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070608

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2008-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070608

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69932974 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040913

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01R 9/00 A, 7H 01R 13/629 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI