Global Patent Index - EP 0969558 A1

EP 0969558 A1 2000-01-05 - Battery terminal with cam fastening

Title (en)

Battery terminal with cam fastening

Title (de)

Batteriekontakt mit Nockenbefestigung

Title (fr)

Connecteur de borne de batterie avec une came de verrouillage

Publication

EP 0969558 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500096 A

Priority

ES 9801750 U

Abstract (en)

The terminal is shaped with a bracket or ring, with a perimeter skirt (12), which open ends are extended with appendixes, from the appendices (16,17) extend ears (18,19) in which is mounted the part acting as a lever (21) and cam (22) respectively, one of the appendices (16,17) extends in the side with rison the conductive portion of the electric lead, the bracket or ring (14,15) has a perimeter skirt, which extends into other, showing ears which are provided with holes allowing the fixation and rotation of the lever (20). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 11/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 11/282 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969558 A1 20000105; ES 1040585 U 19990416; ES 1040585 Y 19990816

INPADOC legal status


2001-11-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-11-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-04-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI