Global Patent Index - EP 0969559 A3

EP 0969559 A3 2001-01-31 - Electrical receptacle contact

Title (en)

Electrical receptacle contact

Title (de)

Elektrische Anschlussbuchse

Title (fr)

Contact de prise électrique

Publication

EP 0969559 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99112090 A

Priority

DE 19828985 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0969559A2] An electrical receptacle contact (1) is provided, consisting of a contacting region (2) for contacting a complementary contact blade and a connecting region (3) for connection to an electrical conductor, the contacting region (2) being of box-shaped design with a top wall (8) and a bottom wall (9), and further the contacting region (2) comprises two parallel first contact tongues (13) formed in the bottom wall (9), the top wall (9) comprising at least one first stamping (12) which is oriented into the box-shaped contact region (2) and is intended for contacting the contact blade and which lies opposite the first contact spring tongues (13), and further a web (15) is provided in the bottom wall (9) between the first contact spring tongues (13), running parallel to the first contact spring tongues (13), the web (15) comprising a second stamping (16) which is oriented into the box-shaped contacting region (2) and serves as a protection against overstressing for the first contact spring tongues (13). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/115

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/115 (2006.01); H01R 13/11 (2006.01); H01R 4/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/11 (2013.01); H01R 4/185 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828985 A1 19991230; DE 19828985 B4 20080124; EP 0969559 A2 20000105; EP 0969559 A3 20010131; JP 2000030788 A 20000128

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030611

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030128

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010727

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GEHRKE,HORST

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LIETZ,DIETER

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RINGEL,ROBERT

2000-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOSCHEK,WOLFGANG

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI