Global Patent Index - EP 0969561 A2

EP 0969561 A2 2000-01-05 - AC power plug assembly

Title (en)

AC power plug assembly

Title (de)

Wechselstromsteckereinheit

Title (fr)

Fiche en courant alternatif

Publication

EP 0969561 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98203691 A

Priority

JP 18383798 A

Abstract (en)

AC plug assembly adapted for a housing (10) of electric device made of insulating plastic material which is provided with two openings (11). This plug assembly comprises a pin block (20) including a connecting member (22) and a pair of plug pins (21) integrally formed in the connecting member (22) to permit the plug pins (21) to be protruded out of the housing through the openings (11) formed in the housing (10). The pin block (20) is preferably fixed to the housing by engaging between a first engaging section formed in the connecting member (22) in the vicinity of the base portion of the plug pin (21) and a second engaging section formed in the opening (11) of the housing. The first engaging section is preferably composed of a flange (23) and an annular groove (24). The second engaging section is preferably formed in an annular internal edge (13). These annular groove (24) and annular internal edge (13) can be fit with each other to prevent the plug pins (21) from falling off. Further, the connecting member (22) is fixed securely to the housing through a screw bolt (12). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/512; H01R 13/506

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/502 (2006.01); H01R 13/512 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/28 (2013.01); H01R 13/512 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969561 A2 20000105; EP 0969561 A3 20001129; EP 0969561 B1 20051012; DE 69831861 D1 20060223; DE 69831861 T2 20060706; JP 2000021519 A 20000121; JP 2975989 B1 19991110

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-08-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-06-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081121

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-09-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060713

2006-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69831861

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-02-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-01-31 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-10-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB SE

2005-10-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040924

2001-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI GB SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010514

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 13/512 A, 7H 01R 13/506 B, 7H 01R 13/502 B, 7H 01R 24/06 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI GB SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI