Global patent index - EP 0969572 A2

EP 0969572 A2 2000-01-05 - Electrical connector

Title (en)

Electrical connector

Title (de)

Elektrischer Steckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur électrique

Publication

EP 0969572 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99111236 A

Priority

DE 19828968 A

Abstract (en)

The connector comprises a short-circuit bridge formed through a metallic spring mechanism serving as a latch device, through whose retention force both connector parts are pulled together and held in a defined latch position. The connector (10) comprises two connector parts (12,14) which can be plugged and connected with each other, and which comprise respectively several contacts (16,18). At least one connector part has a short-circuit bridge (24) which connects at least two contacts (18). The short-circuit bridge is formed through a metallic spring mechanism serving simultaneously as latch device, through whose retention force both connector parts are pulled together and held subsequently in a defined latch position, or are separated from each other.

Abstract (de)

Ein elektrischer Steckverbinder (10) umfaßt zwei zusammensteckbare, miteinander verrastbare Verbinderteilen (12, 14), die jeweils mehrere Kontakte (16, 18) aufweisen und von denen zumindest eines mit einer Kurzschlußbrücke (24) versehen ist, über die wenigstens zwei Kontakte (18) elektrisch miteinander verbindbar sind. Die Kurzschlußbrücke (24) umfaßt einen als Rastmittel dienenden metallischen Federmechanismus, durch dessen Federkraft die beiden Verbinderteile (12, 14) in Abhängigkeit vom jeweiligen Steckzustand entweder zusammengezogen und anschließend in einer definierten Rastposition gehalten oder voneinander getrennt werden, wobei der metallische Federmechanismus vorzugsweise so ausgeführt ist, daß die beiden Verbinderteile (12, 14) nach Überwinden eines Scheitelpunktes dieses metallischen Federmechanismus zusammengezogen werden und dabei der durch die Kurzschlußbrücke (24) erzeugte Kurzschluß aufgehoben wird, nachdem mit dem entsprechenden Zusammenführen der beiden Verbinderteile (12, 14) eine elektrische Verbindung zwischen den kurzgeschlossenen Kontakten (18) des betreffenden Verbinderteils (14) und den Kontakten (16) des anderen Verbinderteils (12) hergestellt wurde, während die beiden Verbinderteile (12, 14) vor Überwinden des Scheitelpunkts im Sinne einer Trennung beaufschlagt werden und der Kurzschluß entsprechend aufrechterhalten wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 31/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/627 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/7032 (2013.01); H01R 13/6275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19828968 A1 19991230; EP 0969572 A2 20000105; EP 0969572 A3 20010124

INPADOC legal status

2002-08-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010725

2001-11-15 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 31/08 A, 7H 01R 13/703 B, 7H 01R 13/627 B

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI