Global Patent Index - EP 0969575 A1

EP 0969575 A1 2000-01-05 - Spark plug

Title (en)

Spark plug

Title (de)

Zündkerze

Title (fr)

Bougie d'allumage

Publication

EP 0969575 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99110651 A

Priority

DE 19829443 A

Abstract (en)

The ignition plug has an isolator (3',3''), two electrodes (4,5) mounted on one end and a thread (6) for fixing in an engine block. The thread is arranged on the other end and protrudes beyond the isolator in cross-section. The isolator has a stop arrangement (8) that becomes effective when the plug rotates. An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Zündkerze für Brennkraftmaschinen, bestehend aus einem Isolator, zwei an einem Ende angeordneten Elektroden und einem Gewinde zum Befestigen in einem Motorblock ist das Gewinde am anderen Ende angeordnet und steht im Querschnitt über den Isolator hinaus. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 13/08; H01T 13/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/08 (2006.01); H01T 13/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/44 (2013.01); H01T 13/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969575 A1 20000105; EP 0969575 B1 20030827; DE 19829443 A1 20000105; ES 2205637 T3 20040501

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080602

2009-02-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080602

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070628

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060726

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-06-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060526

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205637 T3

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906741 P 20031002

2003-09-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000821

2000-09-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI