Global Patent Index - EP 0969662 A1

EP 0969662 A1 2000-01-05 - A television schedule system

Title (en)

A television schedule system

Title (de)

Fernsehprogrammsystem

Title (fr)

Système de programme de télévision

Publication

EP 0969662 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202116 A

Priority

  • EP 91919325 A
  • US 57955590 A

Abstract (en)

An electronic program guide comprising: television program listings, each listing including title, telecast time, and channel, a time and channel grid guide (24) in which some of the television program listings are displayed, a moveable cursor (32) for selectively highlighting one of the television program listings displayed in the grid guide, means for changing the time and channel grid guide (24) into a single channel guide (58) of the channel of a highlighted television program listing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/445

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/7826 (2006.01); B64C 30/00 (2006.01); G04G 15/00 (2006.01); G06F 3/00 (2006.01); G06F 3/023 (2006.01); G06F 3/033 (2006.01); G06F 3/048 (2006.01); G06F 3/14 (2006.01); G06F 13/00 (2006.01); G11B 15/02 (2006.01); G11B 27/00 (2006.01); G11B 27/10 (2006.01); G11B 27/11 (2006.01); G11B 27/30 (2006.01); G11B 27/32 (2006.01); G11B 27/34 (2006.01); G11B 27/36 (2006.01); G11B 33/10 (2006.01); H04N 5/445 (2011.01); H04N 5/76 (2006.01); H04N 5/7617 (2006.01); H04N 5/765 (2006.01); H04N 5/775 (2006.01); H04N 5/782 (2006.01); H04N 5/91 (2006.01); H04N 7/025 (2006.01); H04N 7/03 (2006.01); H04N 7/035 (2006.01); H04N 7/088 (2006.01); H04N 7/16 (2011.01); H04N 21/41 (2011.01); H04N 21/431 (2011.01); H04N 21/433 (2011.01); H04N 21/436 (2011.01); H04N 21/458 (2011.01); H04N 21/472 (2011.01); H04N 21/482 (2011.01); H04N 21/485 (2011.01); H04N 21/84 (2011.01); H04N 21/858 (2011.01); H04N 5/44 (2011.01); H04N 21/422 (2011.01); H04N 21/47 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 21/4858 (2013.01); B64C 30/00 (2013.01); G04G 15/006 (2013.01); G06F 3/0482 (2013.01); G06F 3/04892 (2013.01); G11B 15/023 (2013.01); G11B 27/10 (2013.01); G11B 27/107 (2013.01); G11B 27/11 (2013.01); G11B 27/3054 (2013.01); G11B 27/324 (2013.01); G11B 27/328 (2013.01); G11B 27/34 (2013.01); G11B 27/36 (2013.01); G11B 33/10 (2013.01); H04N 5/44543 (2013.01); H04N 5/765 (2013.01); H04N 5/775 (2013.01); H04N 5/782 (2013.01); H04N 7/025 (2013.01); H04N 7/088 (2013.01); H04N 7/0884 (2013.01); H04N 7/0887 (2013.01); H04N 7/0888 (2013.01); H04N 7/163 (2013.01); H04N 7/165 (2013.01); H04N 21/4135 (2013.01); H04N 21/4314 (2013.01); H04N 21/4316 (2013.01); H04N 21/4334 (2013.01); H04N 21/43622 (2013.01); H04N 21/4583 (2013.01); H04N 21/47214 (2013.01); H04N 21/482 (2013.01); H04N 21/4821 (2013.01); H04N 21/4828 (2013.01); H04N 21/84 (2013.01); H04N 21/858 (2013.01); G11B 2220/41 (2013.01); G11B 2220/65 (2013.01); G11B 2220/80 (2013.01); G11B 2220/90 (2013.01); H04N 5/44504 (2013.01); H04N 21/42204 (2013.01); H04N 21/47 (2013.01); H04N 21/485 (2013.01); H04N 2005/4423 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] WO 8903085 A1 19890406 - FOX JAMES C [US]
  • [A] ZEISEL G ET AL: "AN INTERACTIVE MENU-DRIVEN REMOTE CONTROL UNIT FOR TV-RECEIVERS AND VC-RECORDERS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, VOL. 34, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 814 - 818, ISSN: 0098-3063, XP000008159

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9204801 A1 19920319; AT 191596 T 20000415; AT 220273 T 20020715; AT 270808 T 20040715; AT 287175 T 20050115; AT 300833 T 20050815; AT 516664 T 20110715; CA 2091160 A1 19920311; CA 2091160 C 19991214; CA 2284587 A1 19920311; CA 2284587 C 20030506; CA 2420426 A1 19920311; CA 2420426 C 20050906; CA 2499751 A1 19920311; CA 2499751 C 20070206; CA 2499757 A1 19920311; CA 2499757 C 20060502; CA 2499761 A1 19920311; CA 2499761 C 20051129; CA 2499765 A1 19920311; CA 2499765 C 20060509; CA 2553384 A1 19920311; CA 2553384 C 20070529; CA 2553385 A1 19920311; CA 2553385 C 20080115; CA 2608607 A1 19920311; CA 2608607 C 20100323; DE 69132096 D1 20000511; DE 69132096 T2 20001116; DE 69133060 D1 20020808; DE 69133060 T2 20030306; DE 69133404 D1 20040812; DE 69133404 T2 20050804; DE 69133439 D1 20050217; DE 69133439 T2 20060105; DE 69133477 D1 20050901; DE 69133477 T2 20060420; DK 0548286 T3 20000911; DK 0969662 T3 20021028; DK 1377049 T3 20061211; EP 0548286 A1 19930630; EP 0548286 A4 19940330; EP 0548286 B1 20000405; EP 0969662 A1 20000105; EP 0969662 B1 20020703; EP 1111912 A1 20010627; EP 1111912 B1 20040707; EP 1244300 A1 20020925; EP 1244300 B1 20050112; EP 1337108 A1 20030820; EP 1337108 B1 20050727; EP 1585321 A1 20051012; EP 1585321 B1 20110713; EP 1653732 A2 20060503; EP 1653732 A3 20071114; ES 2144402 T3 20000616; ES 2180253 T3 20030201; ES 2223395 T3 20050301; ES 2234978 T3 20050701; ES 2244889 T3 20051216; ES 2366191 T3 20111018; GR 3033659 T3 20001031; JP 2001186438 A 20010706; JP 2004088792 A 20040318; JP 2006157946 A 20060615; JP 2006166477 A 20060622; JP 2006174494 A 20060629; JP 2006180524 A 20060706; JP 2006180525 A 20060706; JP 2006187014 A 20060713; JP 2007020220 A 20070125; JP 2009005375 A 20090108; JP 2011024268 A 20110203; JP 3098215 B2 20001016; JP 3600149 B2 20041208; JP 3968067 B2 20070829; JP 3971439 B2 20070905; JP 4020405 B2 20071212; JP 4023814 B2 20071219; JP 4054827 B2 20080305; JP 4054828 B2 20080305; JP H06504165 A 19940512; JP H10208328 A 19980807; US 2001012439 A1 20010809; US 2002186959 A1 20021212; US 2003185545 A1 20031002; US 2004008971 A1 20040115; US 2005044567 A1 20050224; US 2005229214 A1 20051013; US 2005251831 A1 20051110; US 2005251836 A1 20051110; US 2008098431 A1 20080424; US 5479266 A 19951226; US 5479268 A 19951226; US 5949954 A 19990907; US 6167188 A 20001226; US 6498895 B2 20021224; US 6850693 B2 20050201; US 7151886 B2 20061219; US 7187847 B2 20070306; US 7209640 B2 20070424; US 7477832 B2 20090113; US 8069460 B2 20111129; US 8087046 B2 20111227

INPADOC legal status


2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20140108

2014-08-21 [REG DE R042] PATENT'S REVOCATION IN FULL NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 69133060

- Effective date: 20140108

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110911

2012-04-30 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *STARSIGHT TELECAST INC.2830 DE LA CRUZ BOULEVARD,

- Effective date: 20120403

2012-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110911

2012-02-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120206

2012-01-12 [REG DE R039] REVOCATION ACTION FILED

- Document: DE 69133060

- Effective date: 20111017

2011-12-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20110910

2011-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20091218

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-10-26 [REG GB S72Z] CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)

- Free text: APPEAL LODGED 22 JANUARY 2010 AGAINST COURT ORDER DATED 18 DECEMBER 2009. (A3/2010/0158)

2011-10-26 [REG GB S72Z] CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)

- Free text: PATENT REVOKED - STAYED PENDING APPEAL; PATENT REVOKED BY COURT ORDER DATED 18 DECEMBER 2009, STAYED PENDING APPEAL. (HC 08 CO0200).

2011-10-26 [REG GB S72Z] CLAIM OR COUNTERCLAIM FOR REVOCATION BEFORE THE COURT (SECT. 72 PATENTS ACT1977)

- Free text: PATENT REVOKED - APPEAL DISMISSED; APPEAL DATED 29 MARCH 2011 DISMISSED THE APPEAL AGAINST THE COURT ORDER DATED 18 DECEMBER 2009 (HC 08 CO0200). PATENT REVOKED.

2011-10-17 [REG DE R008] CASE PENDING AT FEDERAL PATENT COURT

- Document: DE 69133060

2011-10-05 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20110909

2011-09-30 [BE20] BE: PATENT EXPIRED

- Owner name: *STARSIGHT TELECAST INC.

- Effective date: 20110910

2011-09-26 [REG DK EUP] PATENT EXPIRED

2011-09-21 [REG NL V4] LAPSED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20110910

2011-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-09-11 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69133060

2011-09-10 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69133060

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101018

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-04 [REG FR RG] LIEN (PLEDGE) CANCELLED

2011-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100915

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-02-28 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100908

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100817

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100910

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100921

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100918

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20100913

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100914

- Year of fee payment: 20

2009-06-05 [REG FR GC] LIEN (PLEDGE) CONSTITUTED

2008-09-10 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-07-06 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2007-05-30 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20070413

2007-03-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: IGR GMBH & CO. KG.

2007-01-10 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: IGR GMBH & CO. KG.

- Effective date: 20030403

2007-01-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: STARSIGHT TELECAST, INC.

2003-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: INTERESSENGEMEINSCHAFT FUER RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE G

2003-05-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: INTERESSENGEMEINSCHAFTFUER RUNDFUNKSCHUTZRECHTE GM

- Effective date: 20030403

2003-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2180253 T3

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-13 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403203

2002-10-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-08-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69133060 20020808

2002-07-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 548286

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2002-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 220273 T 20020715

2001-02-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-08-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000705

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOUNG,PATRICK

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROOP,JOHN H.

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EBRIGHT,ALLAN R.

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDERSON,DAVID

2000-05-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FABER MICHAEL W.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOUNG,PATRICK

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROOP,JOHN H.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EBRIGHT,ALLAN R.

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ANDERSON,DAVID

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FABER MICHAEL W.

2000-01-05 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 548286

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE