Global patent index - EP 0969705 A2

EP 0969705 A2 2000-01-05 - Connector particularly for a thin smart card

Title (en)

Connector particularly for a thin smart card

Title (de)

Kontaktträger insbesondere für einen dünnen Smart Card Connector

Title (fr)

Connecteur en particulier pour une carte à puce mince

Publication

EP 0969705 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99112609 A

Priority

DE 19829467 A

Abstract (en)

The contact upper section (21) makes connection to the card pads. A fastening section is embedded in the contact holder (30), and ends at the terminal section (24) connecting to the circuit board (11). The contact holder surrounds the contact to the extent required to accept the loading (14).

Abstract (de)

Kontaktiervorrichtung 10 die folgendes aufweist: einen Kontaktträger 30 und mindestens ein Kontaktelement 20, welches einen Kontaktkuppenteil 21 insbesondere zur Kontaktierung eines Chipkartenkontaktes, einen vom Kontaktträger 30 umschlossenen Befestigungsteil 28 und einen Kontaktteil 24 insbesondere zur Kontaktierung einer Leiterplatte 11 umfaßt, wobei der Befestigungsteil 29 eine Stufe bildet, die innerhalb des Kontaktträgers 30 gelegen ist und wobei desweiteren der Kontaktträger 30 derart ausgebildet ist, daß er das Kontaktelement 20 nur entsprechend dem Auftreten der Belastung 14 umschließt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05K 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/06 (2006.01); H01R 12/04 (2006.01); H01R 12/16 (2006.01); H01R 12/20 (2006.01); H01R 12/32 (2006.01); H01R 13/405 (2006.01); H05K 3/40 (2006.01); H01R 13/24 (2006.01); H01R 43/24 (2006.01); H01R 107/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/2442 (2013.01); H01R 9/091 (2013.01); H01R 43/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 5320552 A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0969705 A2 20000105; EP 0969705 A3 20020116; DE 19829467 A1 20000120; DE 19829467 C2 20030618; JP 2000067973 A 20000303; US 6190213 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-10 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030717

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL SE

2002-09-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020716

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: 7H 05K 3/40 A, 7H 01R 9/09 B

2000-01-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free Format Text: CONNECTOR PARTICULARLY FOR A THIN SMART CARD

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-01-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI