Global patent index - EP 0969794 A2

EP 0969794 A2 2000-01-12 - HAIR CONDITIONING COMPOSITIONS

Title (en)

HAIR CONDITIONING COMPOSITIONS

Title (de)

HAARPFLEGEMITTEL

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS POUR APRES-SHAMPOOINGS

Publication

EP 0969794 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 97908931 A

Priority

US 9703564 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9840046A2] Disclosed are hair conditioning compositions comprising by weight: (a) from about 0.4 % to about 5.0 % of an amidoamine; (b) from about 0.05 % to about 2.0 % of an acid; (c) from about 1 % to about 15 % of a high melting point compound having a melting point of at least about 25 DEG C selected from the group consisting of fatty alcohols, fatty acids, fatty alcohol derivatives, fatty acid derivatives, hydrocarbons, steroids, and mixtures thereof; (d) from about 0.02 % to about 2 % of an oily compound having a melting point of not more than about 25 DEG C selected from the group consisting of a first oily compound, a second oily compound, and mixtures thereof; and (e) water; wherein the molar ratio of the amidoamine to acid is about 1 : 0.3 to about 1 : 1, and wherein the composition is substantially free of quaternary ammonium compounds. Further disclosed are suitable methods of making the conditioning compositions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 8/34 (2006.01); A61K 8/36 (2006.01); A61K 8/42 (2006.01); A61Q 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61Q 5/12 (2013.01); A61K 8/342 (2013.01); A61K 8/361 (2013.01); A61K 8/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9840046A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9840046 A2 19980917; WO 9840046 A3 19981203; AU 2071897 A 19980929; EP 0969794 A2 20000112

INPADOC legal status

2002-04-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010926

2001-06-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010515

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MITSUMATSU, ARATA

2000-04-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAKAMURA, KIICHIRO

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MITSUMATSU, ARATA

2000-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NAKAMURA, KIICHIRO

2000-01-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990927

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE